Roed v. Association of Apartment Owners of Terrazza/Cortebella/Las Brisas/Tiburon
Plaintiff: William Norman Roed and Lilia Dejose Roed
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Terrazza/Cortebella/Las Brisas/Tiburon
Case Number: 1:2019cv00514
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 EO: To allow Plaintiffs additional time to serve the First Amended Complaint and Defendant to file a response, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 11/25/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 01/27/2020, at 9:30 a.m., in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 01/20/2020. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(mansfield2)
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Association of Apartment Owners of Terrazza/Cortebella/Las Brisas/Tiburon. (emt, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 12 Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 EO: In light of the allegations contained in the #10 First Amended Complaint, the Court takes no further action on its #9 Order to Show Cause. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Association of Apartment Owners of Terrazza/Cortebella/Las Brisas/Tiburon, filed by William Norman Roed, Lilia Dejose Roed.(Ho, Timothy) Modified on 10/9/2019 (emt, ).
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 9/30/2019. "Accordingly, Plaintiffs are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiffs must file a response to this Order to Show Cause by October 11, 2019, identifying Defendant's citizenship(s). Failure to timely respond to this Order to Show Cause will result in a finding that Plaintiffs have failed to carry their burden of establishing subject matter jurisdiction and the Court will dismiss the action without prejudice." (jo)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Association of Apartment Owners of Terrazza/Cortebella/Las Brisas/Tiburon (jo)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 11/25/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00514 JAO-KJM on all further pleadings. (jo)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by William Norman Roed Notice of Related Cases William Norman Roed. (Ho, Timothy)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by William Norman Roed. (Ho, Timothy)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Association of Apartment Owners of Terrazza/Cortebella/Las Brisas/Tiburon ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2267903.), filed by William Norman Roed.(Ho, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roed v. Association of Apartment Owners of Terrazza/Cortebella/Las Brisas/Tiburon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Norman Roed
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Represented By: Timothy E. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilia Dejose Roed
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Represented By: Timothy E. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Terrazza/Cortebella/Las Brisas/Tiburon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?