Lee v. Painter
Appellant: Adam Lee
In Re: In The Matter Of:
Appellee: Enver W. Painter, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00522
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 EO: Appellant Adam Lee's ("Appellant") Opposition to Appellee Enver W. Painter's ("Appellee") Motion to Dismiss Appellant's Appeal of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Hawaii's Amended Notice of Entry of Order or Judgment, dated September 18, 2019, which amended an August 29, 2019 Bankruptcy Court Order Granting First Interim Application by General Counsel to Chapter 7 Trustees for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses (ECF No. #3 ) was due on November 4, 2019. See ECF No. 4 (Order directing Appellant to file his Opposition, limited to the issue of appellate jurisdiction only, by November 4, 2019).As of November 8, 2019, no Opposition was filed. Appellant is therefore ORDERED to file a written response by November 25, 2019, stating whether he intends to oppose the Motion to Dismiss and if so, why he failed to meet the November 4, 2019 deadline. Failure to file a written response by November 25, 2019 may result in automatic dismissal for failure to prosecute this action. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 U.S. Bankruptcy Court's Certificate of Readiness (Attachments: #1 Notice of Completion of Record on Appeal) (jo)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 EO: On October 12, 2019, Appellee Enver W. Painter ("Appellee") filed a Motion to Dismiss Appellant Adam Lee's ("Appellant") Appeal of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Hawaii's Amended Notice of Entry of Order or Judgment, dated September 18, 2019, which amended an August 29, 2019 Bankruptcy Court Order Granting First Interim Application by General Counsel to Chapter 7 Trustees for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses. ECF No. #3 . Appellee contends that the Appeal should be dismissed for lack of appellate jurisdiction. The court DIRECTS Appellant to file an Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss by November 4, 2019, to which Appellee may file an optional Reply by November 12, 2019. This briefing shall be limited to the issue of appellate jurisdiction only-that is, the court will not address the merits of the appeal at this time. After reviewing the briefing, the court will determine whether to hold a hearing. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh)
October 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Enver W. Painter, Jr appearing for Appellee Enver W. Painter, Jr (Painter, Enver)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00522 JMS-WRP on all further pleadings. (jo)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT: NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT Bankruptcy Court case number 13-01356 - filed by Adam Lee. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #2 Order Granting First Interim Application By General Counsel to Chapter 7 Trustees For Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses, #3 Amended Notice of Entry of Order or Judgment, #4 Optional Appellee Statement of Election to Proceed in District Court) (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Adam Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In The Matter Of:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Enver W. Painter, Jr.
Represented By: Enver W. Painter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?