Bylsma v. State of Hawaii et al
Plaintiff: David G. Bylsma
Defendant: Hakim Ouansafi, David Stehlin, Robei Broadus, State of Hawaii, Hawaii Public Housing Authority and David Ige
Case Number: 1:2019cv00535
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 UPDATED "in forma pauperis" - by Plaintiff David G. Bylsma. (emt, )
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES re #3 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 11/12/2019. If Bylsma elects to continue with this action, Bylsma must fully complete and sign the Court's Application to Proceed in forma pauperis, or pay the civil filing fees in full by November 22, 2019. Failure to do so will result in automatic dismissal of this action. In re Perroton, 958 F.2d 889, 890 (9th Cir. 1992) (affirming dismissal of pro se litigant's claim for failure to pay required filing fees). Should he file a new IFP Application, Bylsma must include the information he has provided thus far in his IFP application and state whether or not he is employed, his gross pay, and his take home-pay. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail Bylsma a blank Application to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (AO 240) and the accompanying instruction sheet so that he may comply with this Order. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - David G. Bylsma shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on November 12, 2019. A copy of the Court's AO 240 form, Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, shall be included in the mailing to Mr. Bylsma.
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/26/2019 is CONTINUED to 2/11/2020 at 09:30AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 11/26/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff David G. Bylsma. (emt, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by David G. Bylsma. (emt, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; (Jury - No) against All Defendants - filed by David G. Bylsma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A, A2, #2 (Proposed) Summons - not issued ) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bylsma v. State of Hawaii et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David G. Bylsma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hakim Ouansafi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Stehlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robei Broadus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Public Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?