Meridian OHC Partners, LP v. Davis, et al
Plaintiff: Meridian OHC Partners, LP
Defendant: Michael A. Davis, David M. Mulder, Nancy E. Katz, Walter B. Menzel, Gerald R. Cysewski, David L. Vied and Cyanotech Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00536
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO BRITTANY ROGERS re #27 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 11/27/2019. (emt, )
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO ABBY F. RUDZIN re #26 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 11/27/2019. (emt, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Brittany Rogers Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2296924.Nicholas R. Monlux appearing for Defendants Gerald R. Cysewski, Nancy E. Katz, Walter B. Menzel, David M. Mulder, David L. Vied (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 [Propsed] Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Monlux, Nicholas)
November 26, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Abby F. Rudzin Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2296921.Nicholas R. Monlux appearing for Defendants Gerald R. Cysewski, Nancy E. Katz, Walter B. Menzel, David M. Mulder, David L. Vied (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 [Propsed] Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Monlux, Nicholas)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO STEPHEN PATRICK BLAKE re #21 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 11/25/2019. (emt, )
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO JAMES GLENN KREISSMAN re #20 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 11/25/2019. (emt, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas R. Monlux on behalf of Gerald R. Cysewski, Nancy E. Katz, Walter B. Menzel, David M. Mulder, David L. Vied on behalf of Gerald R. Cysewski, Nancy E. Katz, Walter B. Menzel, David M. Mulder, David L. Vied. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Monlux, Nicholas)
November 22, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Louie on behalf of Gerald R. Cysewski, Nancy E. Katz, Walter B. Menzel, David M. Mulder, David L. Vied on behalf of Gerald R. Cysewski, Nancy E. Katz, Walter B. Menzel, David M. Mulder, David L. Vied. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Louie, David)
November 22, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen Patrick Blake Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2295450.Lindsay N. McAneeley appearing for Defendant Cyanotech Corporation (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel Stephen Patrick Blake)(McAneeley, Lindsay)
November 22, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice as to James Glenn Kreissman Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2295428.Lindsay N. McAneeley appearing for Defendant Cyanotech Corporation (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel James Glenn Kreissman)(McAneeley, Lindsay)
November 22, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay N. McAneeley on behalf of Cyanotech Corporation on behalf of Cyanotech Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McAneeley, Lindsay)
November 21, 2019 Filing 18 EO: Because of the parties' anticipated motions, the Court finds good cause to CONTINUE the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2020 to 4/6/2020 at 9:30 a.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (agh)
November 15, 2019 Filing 17 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/2019 is CONTINUED to 1/7/2020 at 09:30AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
November 5, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint; Summons served on Cyanotech Corporation, a Nevada corporation on 10/30/2019, filed by Meridian OHC Partners, LP. (Ikeda, Ashley)
October 30, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Meridian OHC Partners, LP. Gerald R. Cysewski served on 10/26/2019. (Ikeda, Ashley) Modified on 11/6/2019 (ens).
October 24, 2019 Filing 14 EO: In light of Plaintiff's #13 Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause ("OSC"), the Court takes no further action on the OSC. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE re #12 Order to Show Cause,,, Plaintiff's Response to October 10, 2019 Order to Show Cause filed by Meridian OHC Partners, LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott Shuda, #2 Declaration of Benny C. Goodman III, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Chang, Jerry) (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/23/2019) (mta, ).
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 10/10/2019. Absent the foregoing information, the Court is unable to ascertain whether diversity jurisdiction exists. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff must file a response to this Order to Show Cause by October 24, 2019, providing complete information concerning its citizenship and that of Cyanotech. Failure to timely respond to this Order to Show Cause will result in a finding that Plaintiff has failed to carry its burden of establishing subject-matter jurisdiction and the Court will dismiss the action without prejudice. Show Cause Response due by 10/24/2019. (emt, )
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO ERIK W. LUEDEKE re #9 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 10/9/2019. (emt, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number HI027429 re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( as to Erik W. Luedeke, Esq.) Filing fee $ 300. (emt, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( as to Erik W. Luedeke, Esq.) Filing fee $ 300, receipt #: HI027429 (see ECF No. #10 ) Ashley K Ikeda appearing for Plaintiff Meridian OHC Partners, LP (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel and Consent, #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Ikeda, Ashley) Modified on 10/9/2019 to add receipt # to entry, docket text modified (emt, ).
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO BENNY C. GOODMAN III re #3 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 10/3/2019. (emt, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants (jo)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 12/2/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00536 JAO-WRP on all further pleadings. (jo)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2271441.Ashley K Ikeda appearing for Plaintiff Meridian OHC Partners, LP, Derivatively on Behalf of CYANOTECH CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Consent, #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Ikeda, Ashley)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Meridian OHC Partners, LP, Derivatively on Behalf of CYANOTECH CORPORATION. (Ikeda, Ashley)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY, ABUSE OF CONTROL, GROSS MISMANGEMENT, AND WASTE OF CORPORATE ASSETS against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2271416.), filed by Meridian OHC Partners, LP, Derivatively on Behalf of CYANOTECH CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Demand for Jury Trial, #3 [Proposed] Summons)(Ikeda, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meridian OHC Partners, LP v. Davis, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Mulder
Represented By: David M. Louie
Represented By: Abby F. Rudzin
Represented By: Brittany Rogers
Represented By: Nicholas R. Monlux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy E. Katz
Represented By: David M. Louie
Represented By: Abby F. Rudzin
Represented By: Brittany Rogers
Represented By: Nicholas R. Monlux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter B. Menzel
Represented By: David M. Louie
Represented By: Abby F. Rudzin
Represented By: Brittany Rogers
Represented By: Nicholas R. Monlux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald R. Cysewski
Represented By: David M. Louie
Represented By: Abby F. Rudzin
Represented By: Brittany Rogers
Represented By: Nicholas R. Monlux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Vied
Represented By: David M. Louie
Represented By: Abby F. Rudzin
Represented By: Brittany Rogers
Represented By: Nicholas R. Monlux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyanotech Corporation
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Blake
Represented By: James Glenn Kreissman
Represented By: Lindsay N. McAneeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meridian OHC Partners, LP
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Represented By: Benny C. Goodman, III
Represented By: Erik W. Luedeke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?