Barreto v. Association of Apartment Owners of Hale Moani
Plaintiff: Pedro E. Barreto, Pedro Enrique Barreto and Taharaa Potini Wong
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Hale Moani
Case Number: 1:2019cv00542
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 EO: Pursuant to Plaintiffs' request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/19 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 1/30/2020 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 1/23/20. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pedro Enrique Barreto, Taharaa Potini Wong. Association of Apartment Owners of Hale Moani waiver sent on 11/12/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Ho, Timothy)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 12/2/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00542 HG-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Pedro E. Barreto Notice of Related Cases Pedro E. Barreto. (Ho, Timothy)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Pedro E. Barreto. (Ho, Timothy)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Association of Apartment Owners of Hale Moani ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2272955.), filed by Pedro E. Enrique Barreto, Taharaa Potini Wong.(Ho, Timothy) Docket text modified on 10/7/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barreto v. Association of Apartment Owners of Hale Moani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro E. Barreto
Represented By: Timothy E. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Enrique Barreto
Represented By: Timothy E. Ho
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taharaa Potini Wong
Represented By: Timothy E. Ho
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Hale Moani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?