Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Szatmari
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: Peter Szatmari
Case Number: 1:2019cv00544
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 EO: For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS #10 Plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission's Ex Parte Application for Order to Serve Defendant Peter Szatmari by Publication. Plaintiff may serve Defendant Peter Szatmari by publication in compliance with Hawaii Revised Statutes 634-36. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 12/04/2019. (mansfield2)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM re #10 EX PARTE Application for Order to Serve Defendant by Publication filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Arnold, Camille)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 EX PARTE Application for Order to Serve Defendant by Publication Camille Arnold appearing for Plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Camille Arnold in Support of Ex Parte Application for Service By Publication, #2 Declaration of Susan Gradman in Support of Ex Parte Application for Service By Publication, #3 Proposed Order)(Arnold, Camille)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 EO: Plaintiff informs the Court that they are in the process of filing a Motion for Publication no later than November 25, 2019, therefore request that the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference be continued to allow sufficient time for publication and for the Defendant to answer. Request is hereby granted. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 12/02/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 01/23/2020 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 01/16/2020. Plaintiff's counsel to notify the Defendant. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Commodity Futures Trading Commission as to Peter Szatmari. (Gradman, Susan)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Commodity Futures Trading Commission as to Peter Szatmari. (Gradman, Susan)
October 7, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY: Please be advised docket entry #1 Complaint, filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission does not include information that identifies the filer. The filing party may refer to LR10.2.(b) Identification of Person Filing a Document, which states "The name, Hawaii bar identification number, address, telephone number, facsimile number, and e-mail address of counsel (or, if pro se, of the party), and the specific identification of each party represented by name and interest in the litigation (e.g., plaintiff, defendant, etc.) shall appear in the upper left-hand corner of the first page of each paper presented for filing..."; (jo)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 Summonses Issued as to Peter Szatmari (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 Summons Issued) (jo)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 12/2/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00544 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (jo)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Gradman, Susan)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief, Civil Monetary Penalties, and Other Equitable Relief against Peter Szatmari, filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Gradman, Susan) Docket text modified on 10/7/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Szatmari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Szatmari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: Susan Gradman
Represented By: Scott R. Williamson
Represented By: Camille Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?