Center for Biological Diversity v. Ross
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: Wilbur Ross and National Marine Fisheries Service
Case Number: 1:2019cv00550
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for ECF 1 Complaint ECF 1-1 Civil Cover Sheet 2 ECF 5 5-6 Issued Summons ECF 7 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference ECF 7-1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements ECF 8 Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure ECF 8-1 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons ECF 8-2 Waiver of Service of Summons ECF 9 Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge ECF 9-1 Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge Election Form ECF 10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ECF 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement ECF 12 Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Motion served on Wilbur Ross, Secretary U.S. Department of Commerce, National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney GeneralWilbur Ross, Secretary U.S. Department of Commerce, National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General on October 22, 2019 and October 28, 2019, filed by Center for Biological Diversity., REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Wilbur Ross, Secretary U.S. Department of Commerce, National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney GeneralWilbur Ross, Secretary U.S. Department of Commerce, National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General on October 19, 2019 by Center for Biological Diversity.( Waiver of Service due by 12/20/2019.) (Phillips, Maxx)
November 15, 2019 Filing 14 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/09/2019 is CONTINUED to 1/27/2020 at 09:45AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
October 19, 2019 Filing 13 Consent Election Form
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO CARI MIYOKO SAKASHITA re: #10 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 10/10/2019. CARI MIYOKO SAKASHITA, ESQ. added as attorney Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff (jo)
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 First Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Biological Diversity. (Phillips, Maxx)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Cari Miyoko Sakashita Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2275564.Maxx Elizabeth Phillips appearing for Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity (Phillips, Maxx)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. (emt, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 12/9/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to National Marine Fisheries Service. (emt, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Wilbur Ross, Secretary, U.S. Department of Commerce. (emt, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00550 WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Phillips, Maxx)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Phillips, Maxx)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Cauliflower coral) for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2275411.), filed by Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Phillips, Maxx) Modified on 10/10/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity v. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Cari Miyoko Sakashita
Represented By: Maxx Elizabeth Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?