Holt v. Saul
Plaintiff: Andrew W. Holt
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv00555
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Plaintiff Andrew W. Holt and Defendant Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. Please continue to reflect case number CV 19-00555 KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 Consent Election Form (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 Consent Election Form
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Asim H. Modi on behalf of Andrew M. Saul on behalf of Andrew M. Saul. (Modi, Asim)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel S. Moriyama on behalf of Andrew M. Saul on behalf of Andrew M. Saul. (Moriyama, Rachel)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. (emt, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney, Social Security Administration, and U.S. Attorney General. (emt, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00555 KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
October 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Haar, Diane)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Review of Social Security Disability Insurance Determination against Andrew M. Saul, Social Security Commissioner ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2276800.), filed by Andrew W. Holt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haar, Diane) Docket text modified on 10/15/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holt v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Asim H. Modi
Represented By: Rachel S. Moriyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew W. Holt
Represented By: Diane C. Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?