United States of America v. TWOL, LLC
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: TWOL, LLC, Nguyen Ngoc Tran, Cong Van Nguyen, Loi Chi Hang and Nguyen Ngoc Van
Case Number: 1:2019cv00562
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 19 Scheduling Conference Statement of Defendants, TWOL LLC, Loi Hang, and Nguyen Tran. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ho, Bryan)
December 9, 2019 Filing 18 Scheduling Conference Statement of the United States. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vickey)
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vickey)
November 13, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TWOL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ho, Bryan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Loi Chi Hang, TWOL, LLC, Nguyen Ngoc Tran. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ho, Bryan)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Loi Chi Hang served on 10/23/19. (Quinn, Vickey) Modified on 11/4/2019 (ens).
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Nguyen Ngoc Tran served on 10/23/19. (Quinn, Vickey) Modified on 11/4/2019 (ens).
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Cong Van Nguyen served on 10/23/19. (Quinn, Vickey) Modified on 11/4/2019 (ens).
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. TWOL, LLC served on 10/23/19. (Quinn, Vickey) Modified on 11/4/2019 (ens).
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Cong Van Nguyen (jo)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Loi Chi Hang (jo)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Nguyen Ngoc Tran (jo)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to TWOL, LLC (jo)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 12/16/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00562 DKW-RT on all further pleadings. (jo)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Vickey L. Quinn on behalf of United States of America on behalf of United States of America. (Quinn, Vickey)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Attachments: #1 TWOL Summons, #2 Nguyen Ngoc Tran Summons, #3 Loi Chi Hang Summons, #4 Cong Van Nguyen Summons)(Underhill, R.)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA against TWOL, LLC, NGUYEN NGOC TRAN, a/k/a NGUYEN NGOC VAN, LOI CHI HANG, and CONG VAN NGUYEN filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Underhill, R.) Docket Text Modified on 10/18/2019 (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. TWOL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWOL, LLC
Represented By: Bryan Y.Y. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nguyen Ngoc Tran
Represented By: Bryan Y.Y. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong Van Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loi Chi Hang
Represented By: Bryan Y.Y. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nguyen Ngoc Van
Represented By: Bryan Y.Y. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: R. Michael Underhill
Represented By: Vickey L. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?