Troiano v. United States of America
Petitioner: James Troiano
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00572
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
2 Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Reassignment; Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER no longer assigned to case Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00572-HG-KJM on all further pleadings. (apg, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00572 HG-WRP on all further pleadings. All docket entries relative to the 28:2255 Motion will be entered in the Criminal Case: CR 05-00261 HG-01. Please reflect the two case numbers: CR 05-00261 HG-01 and CV 19-00572 HG-WRP on all further filings. (jo)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 To Vacate, Set Aside or Correct December 7, 2017 Amended Sentence By A Person in Federal Custody - by Petitioner James Troiano (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Troiano v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Troiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?