Blankenship v. USA
Petitioner: Mark Allen Blankenship
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00593
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S JUDGMENT pursuant to ECF #3 , filed on 11/01/2019 in CR 12-00641JMS. Docket Text Modified on 11/26/2019 (jo)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, ECF NO. 123 , signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/01/2019. Blankenship's 2241 Petition for habeas corpus is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. Blankenship may refile his Petition in the proper jurisdictionthe judicial district in which he is incarcerated, and naming the warden of the facility in which he is incarcerated as Respondent. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment and terminate this action. (apg, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00593 JMS-KJM on all further pleadings. All docket entries relative to the 28:2255 Motion will be entered in the Criminal Case: CR 05-00503-01 JMS. Please reflect the two case numbers: CR 12-00641 JMS and CV 19-00593 JMS-KJM on all further filings. (jo)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 - by Mark Allen Blankenship "Please construe as 2255 writ of habeus corpus. To challenge terms and conditions of confinement." (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blankenship v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Allen Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?