Tanaka v. Trans Union, LLC
Plaintiff: Paanaakala Tanaka
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00642
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO KRISTEN A. DEGRANDE re #22 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 1/24/2020. (emt, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 23 Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Rom A. Trader from Nicholas R. Monlux, Esq., dated January 24, 2020 Re: Pro Hac Vice Attorneys. (emt, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Kristen A. DeGrande Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2323095.Nicholas R. Monlux appearing for Defendant Trans Union, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Monlux, Nicholas)
January 24, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Albert E. Hartmann Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2323083.Nicholas R. Monlux appearing for Defendant Trans Union, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Monlux, Nicholas)
January 24, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael O'Neil Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2323071.Nicholas R. Monlux appearing for Defendant Trans Union, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Monlux, Nicholas)
January 24, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Withdraw as Co-Counsel Nicholas R. Monlux appearing for Defendant Trans Union, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Evan R. Rutter, #2 Declaration of Scott E. Brady, #3 Declaration Nicholas R. Monlux, #4 Certificate of Service)(Monlux, Nicholas)
January 17, 2020 Filing 18 EO: Pursuant to the request of Defendant's Counsel, Nicholas R. Monlux, and with concurrence of Plaintiff's counsel, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 9:00 a.m. is continued to 03/27/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Rom Trader. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 03/20/2020. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO KRISTI C. KELLY, ESQ. re #16 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 1/17/2020. (emt, )
January 14, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Kristi Kelly Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2317205.Andrew J. Guzzo appearing for Plaintiff Paanaakala Tanaka (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristi Kelly, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Guzzo, Andrew)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO SCOTT E. BRADY, ESQ. re #14 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 1/8/2020. (emt, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Scott E. Brady Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2313466.Nicholas R. Monlux appearing for Defendant Trans Union, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Monlux, Nicholas)
December 24, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Monlux, Nicholas)
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 EO: Evan R. Rutter is allowed to participate at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 9:00 a.m. by telephone before Magistrate Judge Rom Trader. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO EVAN R. RUTTER, ESQ. re #10 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 12/16/2019. (emt, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Evan R. Rutter Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2304649.Nicholas R. Monlux appearing for Defendant Trans Union, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Evan R. Rutter, #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Monlux, Nicholas)
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Monlux, Nicholas)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas R. Monlux on behalf of Trans Union, LLC on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Monlux, Nicholas)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Louie on behalf of Trans Union, LLC on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Louie, David)
November 29, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Trans Union, LLC (jo)
November 29, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
November 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 1/27/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
November 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00642 LEK-RT on all further pleadings. (jo)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Guzzo, Andrew)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Trans Union, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2297831.), filed by Paanaakala Tanaka. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Guzzo, Andrew) Modified on 12/2/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tanaka v. Trans Union, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paanaakala Tanaka
Represented By: Andrew J. Guzzo
Represented By: Kristi C. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Evan R. Rutter
Represented By: Nicholas R. Monlux
Represented By: Kristen A. DeGrande
Represented By: David M. Louie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?