Island Leasing, LLC v. Kane et al
Defendant: AAR Supply Chain Inc.
Appellant: Island Leasing, LLC
In Re: In The Matter Of:
Appellee: Elizabeth A. Kane
Case Number: 1:2019cv00655
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 7 EO: COURT ORDER DIRECTING ALL PARTIES TO FILE LETTER BRIEFS. The parties' letter briefs must not exceed three pages each and must be submitted to this Court via hand-delivery, United States mail, or facsimile to (808) 541-1386, by no later than February 13, 2020. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI) (afe)
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Bankruptcy Appeals CV 19-00436 JMS-RT; CV 19-00655 LEK-WRP; and CV 19-00681 LEK-KJM filed by Elizabeth A. Kane. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Duffy, Carisa)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Bankruptcy Appeals CV 19-00436 JMS-RT; CV 19-00655 LEK-WRP; and CV 19-00681 LEK-KJM Christopher J. Muzzi appearing for Appellant Island Leasing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Certificate of Service)(Muzzi, Christopher)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 EO: Briefing Deadlines Issued. Appellant Brief due by 2/18/2020. Appellant Reply Brief due by 4/2/2020. Appellee Brief due by 3/19/2020. Oral Arguments are set for 4/24/2020 10:30 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI) (afe)
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 U.S. Bankruptcy Court's Certificate of Readiness. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #2 Appellant Island Leasing, LLC's Statement of Issues on Appeal/Designation of Record, #3 Docket Sheet, Adversary Proceeding # 18-90007, #4 Notice of Completion of Record on Appeal) (emt, )
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00655 LEK-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (Notice of Transmittal to District Court). Bankruptcy Court case number 17-01078 - filed by Island Leasing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, Adversary Proceeding # 18-90007) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Island Leasing, LLC v. Kane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Island Leasing, LLC
Represented By: Rahman Connelly
Represented By: Leila M Rothwell Sullivan
Represented By: Darryl P. Rains
Represented By: Christopher J. Muzzi
Represented By: Lorenzo Marinuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAR Supply Chain Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy M. Downs
Represented By: Veronica A Nordyke
Represented By: Michael A. Yoshida
Represented By: David E. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In The Matter Of:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Elizabeth A. Kane
Represented By: Wendy F. Hanakahi
Represented By: Elaine T. Chow
Represented By: Simon Klevansky
Represented By: Alika L. Piper
Represented By: Carisa L. K. Duffy
Represented By: Paul Alston
Represented By: Nickolas A. Kacprowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?