Kimura v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Karl Kimura
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00662
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Case transferred to Northern District of California. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent via CM/ECF. (jo)
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 (CERTIFIED) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-177), MDL NO. 2741, received from the Northern District of California. (jo)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ENTRY ORDER re #8 (UNCERTIFIED) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-177), MDL NO. 2741, Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 12/27/2019. As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. California for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. (jo)
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 (UNCERTIFIED) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-177), MDL NO. 2741, Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of October 3, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. The transmittal of this order to said Clerk shall be stayed 7 days from the entry thereof. If any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this 7-day period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel. (jo)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karl Kimura. Monsanto Company served on 12/19/2019. (Green, Michael)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Karl Kimura. (Green, Michael)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company (jo)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 2/10/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00662 JMS-RT on all further pleadings. (jo)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; Demand For Jury Trial; Summons against Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2304130.), filed by Karl Kimura.(Green, Michael) Modified on 12/12/2019 (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimura v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Kimura
Represented By: Maria F. Penn
Represented By: Denise M. Hevicon
Represented By: Michael Jay Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?