Emrit v. Universal Music Group et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Defendant: Estate of Shakir Stewart, Island Def Jam Group, Universal Music Group and Rick Ross
Case Number: 1:2019cv00670
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable sent to Ronald Satish Emrit on 12/16/2019 re ECFs #1 , #2 , and #3 (jo)
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered 1/28/2020 pursuant to ECF #7 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE THE COMPLAINT AND DENY PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS (jo)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Ronald Satish Emrit will be served by First Class Mail on January 28, 2020 to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) and the Maryland address noted in #1 Complaint)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE THE COMPLAINT AND DENY PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS (ECF No. #4 ) - Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 1/28/2020. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Ronald Satish Emrit will be served by First Class Mail on January 28, 2020 to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) and the Maryland address noted in #1 Complaint
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS; CD received via Amazon.com as Extrinsic Evidence to Prove Copyright Ownership of the song "Dilemma" off of "Welcome to Atlantis" by submitted Ronald Satish Emrit. CD retained by Clerk's Office. (apg, )
January 9, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - a copy of #4 Findings and Recommendations has been sent to Ronald Satish Emrit, 11207 Lincoln Avenue, Hagerstown, Maryland 21740 (sister's address as noted in #1 Complaint) by First Class Mail on January 9, 2020. (jo)
January 2, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Copies of #1 , #2 , and #3 were resent to Ronald Satish Emrit, 11207 Lincoln Avenue, Hagerstown, Maryland 21740 (sister's address and current location) by First Class Mail on January 2, 2020. (jo)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable sent to Ronald Satish Emrit re: ECFs #1 , #2 , and #3 (jo)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE THE COMPLAINT AND DENY PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS re: #1 , #2 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 12/18/2019. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Ronald Satish Emrit will be served by First Class Mail on December 18, 2019 to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 2/10/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION To Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Ronald Satish Emrit (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Ronald Satish Emrit (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Mailing Envelope) (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emrit v. Universal Music Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Shakir Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Def Jam Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?