Scalia v. Steve Hoegger & Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Defendant: Steve Hoegger & Associates, Inc. and Steve Hoegger
Case Number: 1:2019cv00675
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS STEVE HOEGGER & ASSOCIATES, INC. and STEVE HOEGGER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/20/2019. (jo)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 Errata re #5 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment Corrected Proposed Consent Judgment. (Schultz, Andrew)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment Andrew J. Schultz appearing for Plaintiff Eugene Scalia (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Judgment)(Schultz, Andrew)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 2/19/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00675 JMS-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and to Recover Amounts Due Under the Fair Labor Standards Act (29 U.S.C. 201 et seq.) against All Defendants, filed by Eugene Scalia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schultz, Andrew) Modified on 12/18/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scalia v. Steve Hoegger & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Hoegger & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Hoegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Represented By: Andrew J. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?