Kane et al v. Island Leasing, LLC
Appellee: AAR Supply Chain, Inc. and Island Leasing, LLC
In Re: In The Matter Of:
Appellant: Elizabeth A. Kane
Case Number: 1:2019cv00681
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
2 Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 ADVISORY ENTRY. Pursuant to the Minute Order Re: Court Order: 1) Consolidating Cases; and 2) Setting Briefing Schedule, filed on February 19, 2020, ECF No. #11 , all future filings relevant to CV 19-00681 LEK-KJM shall be filed only in CV 19-00655 LEK-WRP. (emt, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 11 EO: COURT ORDER: 1) CONSOLIDATING CASES; AND 2) SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE On January 17, 2020, Island Leasing, LLC ("Island Leasing") filed its Motion to Consolidate Bankruptcy Appeals CV 19-00436 JMS-RT; CV 19-00655 LEK-WRP; and CV 19-00681 LEK-KJM ("Motion"). [CV 19-00655 LEK-WRP, dkt. no. 5; CV 19-00681 LEK-KJM, dkt. no. 4.] On February 3, 2020, an entering order was filed in Carbonview Limited, LLC, et al. v. Kane, et al., CV 19-00436 JMS-RT, staying and administratively closing that appeal pending the results of the other two appeals. [CV 19-00436 JMS-RT, dkt. no. 22.] On February 6, 2020, the Court ordered the parties to submit letter briefs regarding the consolidation of cases CV 19-00655 LEK-WRP and CV 19-00681 LEK-KJM. [Entering Order, filed 2/6/20 (dkt. no. 7).] On February 13, 2020, Island Leasing and Elizabeth A. Kane, Bankruptcy Trustee ("Trustee") submitted letters to this Court indicating they were not opposed to consolidating CV 19-00655 LEK-WRP and CV 19-00681 LEK-KJM. See, e.g., CV 19-00655 LEK-WRP, dkt. nos. 9, 10. AAR Supply Chain, Inc. ("AAR") did not file a letter brief.Therefore, the Court HEREBY CONSOLIDATES cases CV 19-00655 LEK-WRP and CV 19-00681 LEK-KJM. All further pleadings are to be filed and docketed in CV 19-00655 LEK-WRP. The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to make an entry in CV 19-00681 LEK-KJM that all future filings relevant to that case are to be filed only in CV 19-00655 LEK-WRP.Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8016(b), Island Leasing is the designated Appellant, and the Trustee and AAR are the designated Appellees. Briefing will be filed in accordance with Rule 8016, as modified by Local Bankruptcy Rule 8009.1 and the schedule below: 1.Island Leasing's Principal Brief is due no later than February 28, 2020, and limited to 25 pages or 6,250 words;2.The Trustee's Principal and Response Brief is due no later than March 30, 2020, and limited to 30 pages or 7,500 words;3.AAR's Principal and Response Brief is also due no later than March 30, 2020, and limited to 30 pages or 7,500 words; 4.Island Leasing's Response and Reply Brief is due no later than April 29, 2020, and limited to 25 pages or 6,250 words;5.The Trustee's Reply Brief is due no later than May 13, 2020, and limited to 15 pages or 3,750 words;6.AAR's Reply Brief is also due no later than May 13, 2020, and limited to 15 pages or 3,750 words; and7.The oral argument currently scheduled in CV 19-00655 LEK-WRP is HEREBY CONTINUED from April 24, 2020, at 10:30 a.m., to July 10, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED.(JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(mrf)
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 Letter addressed to Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi from Christopher J. Muzzi, Esq., dated February 14, 2020 Re: Consolidation and request for extension to file opening brief. (CV 19-00655 LEK-WRP; CV 19-00681 LEK-KJM) (emt, )
February 14, 2020 Filing 9 Letter Brief addressed to Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi from Nickolas A. Kacprowski, Esq. and Wendy F. Hanakahi, Esq., dated February 13, 2020 re #4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases [ CV 19-00655 LEK-WRP; and CV 19-00681 LEK-KJM. (CV 19-00655 LEK-WRP; CV 19-00681 LEK-KJM) (emt, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 8 Letter Brief addressed to Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi from Christopher J. Muzzi, Esq., dated February 12, 2020 re #4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases [CV 19-00655 LEK-WRP; and CV 19-00681 LEK-KJM]. (CV 19-00655 LEK-WRP; CV 19-00681 LEK-KJM) (emt, )
February 6, 2020 Filing 7 EO: COURT ORDER DIRECTING ALL PARTIES TO FILE LETTER BRIEFS. The parties' letter briefs must not exceed three pages each and must be submitted to this Court via hand-delivery, United States mail, or facsimile to (808) 541-1386, by no later than February 13, 2020. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI) (afe) (afe, ).
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Bankruptcy Appeals CV 19-00436 JMS-RT; CV 19-00655 LEK-WRP; and CV 19-00681 LEK-KJM filed by Elizabeth A. Kane. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Duffy, Carisa)
January 22, 2020 Filing 5 U.S. Bankruptcy Court's Certificate of Readiness. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #2 Appellant Trustee's Designation of Record on Appeal and Cross-Appeal and Statement of Issues, #3 Adversary Proceeding # 18-90007, #4 Notice of Completion of Record on Appeal) (emt, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Bankruptcy Appeals CV 19-00436 JMS-RT; CV 19-00655 LEK-WRP; and CV 19-00681 LEK-KJM Christopher J. Muzzi appearing for Appellee Island Leasing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Certificate of Service)(Muzzi, Christopher)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Reassignment; Case reassigned to JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI for all further proceedings. JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE no longer assigned to case Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00681LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. CV 19-00681-JAO-KJM Kane et al v. Island Leasing, LLC Bankruptcy Appeal is a cross appeal of the original BK appeal in CV 19-00655 LEK-WRP. (apg, )
December 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00681 JAO-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM U.S. BANKRUPTCY APPELLATE PANEL. Bankruptcy Court case number BAP No. HI-19-1333., Bk. No. 17-101078. Adv. No. 18-90007 - filed by Elizabeth A. Kane. (Attachments: #1 Amended Transmittal of Cross Appeal to BAP, #2 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #3 Optional Appellee Statement of Election to Proceed in District Court) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kane et al v. Island Leasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: AAR Supply Chain, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy M. Downs
Represented By: Michael A. Yoshida
Represented By: Veronica A Nordyke
Represented By: David E. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Island Leasing, LLC
Represented By: Darryl P. Rains
Represented By: Christopher J. Muzzi
Represented By: Lorenzo Marinuzzi
Represented By: Rahman Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In The Matter Of:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Elizabeth A. Kane
Represented By: Wendy F. Hanakahi
Represented By: Simon Klevansky
Represented By: Carisa L. K. Duffy
Represented By: Alika L. Piper
Represented By: Paul Alston
Represented By: Nickolas A. Kacprowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?