State of Hawaii v. Thronas-Kahoonei
Plaintiff: State of Hawaii
Defendant: Kapana B. Thronas-Kahoonei, Office of the Prosecuting Attorney, Tracy J. Murakami, Justin F. Kollar and Kimberly A Torigoe
Case Number: 1:2019cv00682
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 19 EO: In response to Mr. Andrew Michaels' Request for Non-Appearance or, Alternatively, to Appear by Phone on March 27, 2020 @ 9:00 a.m. ECF #18 the Court permits Mr. Michaels appear by phone. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Kapana B. Thronas-Kahoonei has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 6, 2020 Filing 18 Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Rom A. Trader from Andrew S. Michaels, Deputy County Attorney, dated February 5, 2020, Re: Request for Non-Appearance or, Alternatively, to Participate by Phone in Continued Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for March 27, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. (emt, )
February 5, 2020 Filing 17 Consent Election Form
January 27, 2020 Filing 16 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference convened on 1/27/20 at 9:00 a.m.Here, pro se litigant Kapana Thronas-Kahoonei, removed the appeal of his state criminal conviction which remains pending before the Intermediate Court of Appeals of the State of Hawaii ("ICA") in Case No. CAAP-19-0000638 (ECF No. 1). In his original Notice of Removal (ECF No. 1), Mr. Thronas-Kahoonei identified the State of Hawaii as "Plaintiff" and himself as "Defendant". In two subsequently filed Notices of Removal, however, he identified himself as "Plaintiff" and the "State Hawaii, Kauai Prosecuting Attorney(s)", et al., as "Defendant" (ECF Nos. 5 and 10). Despite the obvious confusion caused by this, consistent with the initial filing (ECF No. 1), the docket in this action lists the State of Hawaii as "Plaintiff" and pro se litigant Mr. Thronas-Kahoonei as "Defendant" notwithstanding the captioning of subsequent filings.Based upon a nearly identical action brought by Mr. Thronas-Kahoone in Kapana Brown Thronas-Kahoonei v. State of Hawaii, et al. (CV 19-00683 JAO-KJM) where on 1/10/20, District Judge Otake ordered the case remanded the case back to the ICA, the Court and parties herein discussed the likelihood of a similar motion being filed in the instant case. See CV 19-000683 JAO-KJM, ECF No. 7. The Court encouraged the parties to discuss whether an agreement may be reached in order to obviate the need to file such a motion.The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is continued to 3/27/20 at 9:00 a.m. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 3/27/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (FTR-Ctrm FTR C5 (8:59 - 9:08).) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Kapana B. Thronas-Kahoonei has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 23, 2020 Filing 15 EO: Kapana B. Thronas-Kahoonei is allowed to participate by telephone at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/20 @ 9:00 a.m. The Court will initiate the telephone call. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 22, 2020 Filing 14 Plaintiff(s) REQUEST to Participate by Phone - by Defendant Kapana B. Thronas-Kahoonei. (emt, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 13 EO: Pursuant to the request of Mr. Andrew Michaels (ECF #12 ), counsel for the County of Kauai, he may appear by phone for the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 01/27/2020 at 9:00 before Magistrate Judge Trader. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Kapana B. Thronas-Kahoonei have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 22, 2020 Filing 12 Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Rom A. Trader from Andrew S. Michaels, Deputy County Attorney, dated January 22, 2020, Re: County of Kauai's request to participate by telephone in the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference scheduled for January 27, 2020. (emt, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 11 Defendants' Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(Michaels, Andrew) Modified on 1/17/2020 (emt, ).
January 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REMOVAL - by Kapana B. Thronas-Kahoonei (jo)
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00682 LEK-RT on all further pleadings. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 Consent Election Form (jo)
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 EO: On 1/3/20, Defendant Kapana Brown Thronas-Kahoonei filed a Letter of Request seeking access to the Case Management Electronic Case Filing System (ECF No. 6). The Court finds the Motion suitable for disposition without a hearing pursuant to Rule 7.1(c) of the Local Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii.Defendant has not indicated that he attended the training required for access and has not provided any reason for his request to file electronically. Accordingly, the Court DENIES the Motion. re #6 Letter of Request E-filing Request for United States District Court for the District of Hawaii. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 Letter of REQUEST for E-filing - by Kapana B. Thronas-Kahoonei. (ens)
December 31, 2019 Filing 5 Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal; AMENDED EXHIBIT B, by Kapana B. Thronas-Kahoonei. (apg, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) (jo) ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed.
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 1/27/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of Hawaii, Intermediate Court of Appeals; Case Number CAAP-19-0000638 - filed by Kapana B. Thronas-Kahoonei (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Filing Fee Receipt #HI027919) (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Hawaii v. Thronas-Kahoonei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kapana B. Thronas-Kahoonei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Prosecuting Attorney
Represented By: Andrew Scott Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy J. Murakami
Represented By: Andrew Scott Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin F. Kollar
Represented By: Andrew Scott Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly A Torigoe
Represented By: Andrew Scott Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?