Fallen Productions, Inc. et al v. DOE
Plaintiff: Rambo V Productions, Inc., HB Productions, Inc., Definition Delaware, LLC and Fallen Productions, Inc.
Defendant: DOE
Case Number: 1:2020cv00033
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 14 EO: The Court CONTINUES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 03/23/2020 at 9:00 a.m. to 04/22/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements to be filed by 04/15/2020. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp) Modified on 3/20/2020 (jp).
March 18, 2020 Filing 13 EO: In accordance with the Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency, issued on 3/17/2020 by Chief District Judge Seabright, until further court order or notice, all proceedings before Magistrate Judge Trader will be conducted by telephone or other electronic means. Counsel shall provide contact information to the Courtroom Manager, Juliet Parker, by emailing same to Juliet_Parker@hid.uscourts.gov no later than 3 business days prior to the court proceeding. In certain cases, however, the physical presence of counsel, parties and party representatives at a particular court proceeding may be required at the discretion of Magistrate Judge Trader. Unless specifically ordered by the court, mandatory chambers copies of filings and other documents are not required for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Trader. Confidential settlement conference statements should be emailed to Trader_Orders@hid.uscourts.gov. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)
March 17, 2020 Filing 12 Scheduling Conference Statement PLAINTIFFS SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT. (Culpepper, Kerry)
February 25, 2020 Filing 11 EO: Motion Hearing is set for 04/09/2020 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER ECF #9 First MOTION Extension of Deadline to Serve Complaint and Summons. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)
February 25, 2020 Filing 10 EX PARTE Motion SECOND EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiffs Definition Delaware, LLC, Fallen Productions, Inc., HB Productions, Inc., Rambo V Productions, Inc. (Culpepper, Kerry)
February 20, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION Extension of Deadline to Serve Complaint and Summons Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiffs Definition Delaware, LLC, Fallen Productions, Inc., HB Productions, Inc., Rambo V Productions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of counsel)(Culpepper, Kerry)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE re #7 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 2/18/2020. (emt, )
February 2, 2020 Filing 7 EX PARTE Motion FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiffs Definition Delaware, LLC, Fallen Productions, Inc., HB Productions, Inc., Rambo V Productions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum re Motion)(Culpepper, Kerry)
January 24, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #3 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright and a copy of the #1 Complaint, shall be served by First Class Mail to the Register of Copyrights, U.S. Copyright Office, 101 Independence Ave., S.E., Washington, D.C., 20559-6000 on January 24, 2020. (emt, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 3/23/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00033 JAO-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Definition Delaware, LLC, Fallen Productions, Inc., HB Productions, Inc., Rambo V Productions, Inc. Copyright Report Definition Delaware, LLC, Fallen Productions, Inc., HB Productions, Inc., Rambo V Productions, Inc.. (Culpepper, Kerry)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Definition Delaware, LLC, Fallen Productions, Inc., HB Productions, Inc., Rambo V Productions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Voltage Productions, LLC for Definition Delaware, LLC ; Corporate Parent Millennium Funding, Inc for Fallen Productions, Inc., HB Productions, Inc., Rambo V Productions, Inc... (Culpepper, Kerry)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for (1) CONTRIBUTORY COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT and (2) DIRECT COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT against DOE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2322878.), filed by Fallen Productions, Inc., Definition Delaware, LLC, Rambo V Productions, Inc., HB Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Declaration of Daniel Arheidt, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Culpepper, Kerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fallen Productions, Inc. et al v. DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rambo V Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HB Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Definition Delaware, LLC
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fallen Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?