United States of America v. Ompoy
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Tracy L. Ompoy, Maui County, Denley J Ompoy, American Savings Bank, F.S.B., First Resolution Investment Corporation, Pinnacle Credit Services, LLC, State of Hawaii, Department of Taxation, John K. Delatori, Tracy L. Delatori and Arlene M. Delatori
Case Number: 1:2020cv00054
Filed: February 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. First Resolution Investment Corporation served on 3/25/2020. (Hendon, Jeremy)
April 1, 2020 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Pinnacle Credit Services, LLC served on 3/25/2020. (Hendon, Jeremy)
April 1, 2020 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. American Savings Bank, F.S.B. served on 3/23/2020. (Hendon, Jeremy)
March 27, 2020 Filing 29 EO: Pursuant to the request of Counsel for the Plaintiff with the agreement of Counsel for the Defendants, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set 04/06/2020 at 9:00 a.m. is CONTINUED to 06/05/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements to be filed by 05/29/2020. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)
March 12, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint by Maui County. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Affirmative Statement of Claim, #2 Certificate of Service)(Tarnstrom, Kristin)
March 11, 2020 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Maui County waiver sent on 2/10/2020, answer due 4/10/2020. (Hendon, Jeremy)
March 6, 2020 Filing 26 Scheduling Conference Statement of Defendant State of Hawaii, Department of Taxation. (Chee, Nathan)
March 6, 2020 Filing 25 Consent Election Form
March 5, 2020 Filing 24 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake on the court's website. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
March 4, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect new Civil Case Number CV 20-00054 JAO-RT on all further pleadings. (jo)
March 3, 2020 Filing 22 Consent Election Form
March 2, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by State of Hawaii, Department of Taxation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Certificate of Service)(Chee, Nathan)
February 24, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Arlene M. Delatori served on 2/10/2020. (Hendon, Jeremy)
February 24, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. John K. Delatori served on 2/10/2020. (Hendon, Jeremy)
February 24, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Tracy L. Ompoy served on 2/10/2020. (Hendon, Jeremy)
February 24, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Denley J Ompoy served on 2/10/2020. (Hendon, Jeremy)
February 5, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hendon, Jeremy)
February 4, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Maui County (jo)
February 4, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to State of Hawaii, Department of Taxation (jo)
February 4, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to American Savings Bank, F.S.B. (jo)
February 4, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to First Resolution Investment Corporation (jo)
February 4, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Pinnacle Credit Services, LLC (jo)
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Arlene M. Delatori (jo)
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to John K. Delatori (jo)
February 4, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Tracy L. Ompoy (jo)
February 4, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Denley J Ompoy (jo)
February 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jo)
February 4, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 4/6/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
February 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 20-00054 RT on all further pleadings. (jo)
February 4, 2020 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Hendon, Jeremy)
February 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Reduce Federal Tax Assessments to Judgment and Foreclose Federal Tax Liens on Real Property against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hendon, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Ompoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy L. Ompoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maui County
Represented By: Kristin K. Tarnstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denley J Ompoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Savings Bank, F.S.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Resolution Investment Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Credit Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Hawaii, Department of Taxation
Represented By: Nathan S.C. Chee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John K. Delatori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy L. Delatori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlene M. Delatori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jeremy J. Butler
Represented By: Jeremy N. Hendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?