Silva v. Crane Company
Plaintiff: Debra Ann Bohol, Mary Ellen Puanani Silva, Charles Silva, Allan E Silva, Jr. and Allan E. Silva, Jr.
Defendant: Crane Company, Does 1 to 25 and Ingersoll Rand Co.
Not Classified By Court: Keith Hunter
Case Number: 1:2020cv00065
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Filing 20 EO: In light of the Joint Status Report [ECF 19], filed 04/3/2020, advising that mediation is scheduled for 05/27/2020, the Court continues the Telephone Conference scheduled for 04/10/2020 at 9:00 a.m. to 06/22/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. CRM to provide dial-in instructions. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)
April 3, 2020 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Rom Trader from L. Richard DeRobertis, Esq., Re: Joint status report by Debra Ann Bohol, Allan E. Silva, Jr, Charles Silva, Mary Ellen Puanani Silva. (DeRobertis, L.) Modified on 4/6/2020 (emt, ).
March 9, 2020 Filing 18 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE not held.Discussion had.Rule 16 scheduling conference continued to 06/22/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. Court to issue Mediation Order.Telephone Status Conference set for 04/10/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. This conference will be jointly held with 1:19-cv-00435-JAO-RT Duff v. Crane Company et al. Counsel to provide telephone number to CRM at juliet_parker@hid.uscourts.gov by 04/07/2020.(Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)
March 9, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #17 ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR has been served by First Class Mail to Keith Hunter, Dispute Prevention and Resolution, Inc., 1003 Bishop Street Pauahi Tower Suite 1155, Honolulu, HI 96813 on March 9, 2020. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 3/9/2020. Keith Hunter added as mediator. Status Conference is set for 4/10/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (emt, )
March 3, 2020 Filing 16 Scheduling Conference Statement Defendant Crane Co.'s Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
March 2, 2020 Filing 15 Plaintiffs' Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DeRobertis, L.) Modified on 3/3/2020 (emt, ).
March 2, 2020 Filing 14 Scheduling Conference Statement DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND CO.'S RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT. (Goodwin, Christopher)
February 19, 2020 Filing 13 Defendant Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint Filed January 9, 2020, CROSSCLAIM against Does 1 to 25, Ingersoll Rand Co. by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
February 18, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT of Planning Meeting [Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Rom A. Trader from L. Richard DeRobertis, Esq., dated February 18, 2020 Re: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference] . (DeRobertis, L.) Modified on 2/19/2020 (emt, ).
February 18, 2020 Filing 11 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake on the court's website. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
February 15, 2020 Filing 10 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Ingersoll Rand Co.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Goodwin, Christopher)
February 15, 2020 Filing 9 Defendant Ingersoll-Rand's ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Crane Company by Ingersoll Rand Co.. (Attachments: #1 Cross-Claim Against Other Defendants, #2 Answer to Cross-Claim Asserted by All Other Defendants Against Ingersoll-Rand Co., #3 Certificate of Service)(Goodwin, Christopher)
February 11, 2020 Filing 8 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii; 1CCV200000036. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certification, #2 Case Detail Docket List) (emt, )
February 10, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 3/9/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT(COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00065 JAO-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Crane Company. (Harstad, William)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 [SUPPLEMENT] [Additional Exhibits to Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal] re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Crane Company, #2 Supplement, filed by Crane Company by Crane Company [ECF 1], [ECF 2]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4a - Forman Affidavit, Ex. A, A-5, A-7, #2 Exhibit 4b - Forman,Samuel.Affidavit. Ex. A-16, A-19, A-24, A-26, A-27, #3 Exhibit Ex 5 - State Court Notice of Notice of Remova, #4 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William) Modified on 2/10/2020 (emt, ).
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 [SUPPLEMENT] [Additional Exhibits to Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal] re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Crane Company by Crane Company [ECF 1]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3b - Sargent,David.Affidavit. Ex. G, H, J, L, #2 Exhibit 3c - Sargent,David.Affidavit. Ex. N, O, P, #3 Exhibit 3d - Sargent,David.Affidavit. Ex. R, T, U)(Harstad, William) Modified on 2/10/2020 (emt, ).
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crane Company Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 1442 & 1446 from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, case number 1CCV-20-0000036. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2330904), filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William M. Harstad, #2 Exhibit 1 - Circuit Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Friemoth Affidavit, Ex. A, B, C, D, #4 Exhibit 3a - Sargent,David.Affidavit, Ex. A, A-1, B, D)(Harstad, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silva v. Crane Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: William M. Harstad
Represented By: Derek B Simon
Represented By: Ian R. Wesley-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Co.
Represented By: Christopher S. Goodwin
Represented By: Robert S. Alcorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Ann Bohol
Represented By: L. Richard DeRobertis
Represented By: Ilana Kananipiliokala Waxman
Represented By: Alyssa R Segawa
Represented By: Allison Mina Aoki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ellen Puanani Silva
Represented By: L. Richard DeRobertis
Represented By: Ilana Kananipiliokala Waxman
Represented By: Alyssa R Segawa
Represented By: Allison Mina Aoki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Silva
Represented By: L. Richard DeRobertis
Represented By: Ilana Kananipiliokala Waxman
Represented By: Alyssa R Segawa
Represented By: Allison Mina Aoki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan E Silva, Jr.
Represented By: L. Richard DeRobertis
Represented By: Ilana Kananipiliokala Waxman
Represented By: Alyssa R Segawa
Represented By: Allison Mina Aoki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan E. Silva, Jr.
Represented By: L. Richard DeRobertis
Represented By: Ilana Kananipiliokala Waxman
Represented By: Alyssa R Segawa
Represented By: Allison Mina Aoki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Keith Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?