Magik v. The Bureaus, Inc
Plaintiff: Chelsea Magik
Defendant: The Bureaus, Inc and Bureaus Investment Group Portfolio No. 15, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00073
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 10 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for May 26, 2020 at 9:30 AM will be held by telephone. The Court will be using AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
March 12, 2020 Filing 9 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 04/13/2020 is CONTINUED to 05/26/2020 at 09:30AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendants of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Services Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 4/13/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
February 14, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Bureaus Investment Group Portfolio No. 15, LLC. (emt, )
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to The Bureaus, Inc. (emt, )
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00073 HG-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against The Bureaus, Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2333730.), filed by Chelsea Magik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One, #2 Exhibit Two, #3 Exhibit Three, #4 Exhibit Four, #5 Exhibit Five, #6 Exhibit Six, #7 Declaration Verification of Complaint, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brackett, Justin) Modified on 2/14/2020 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magik v. The Bureaus, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bureaus, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureaus Investment Group Portfolio No. 15, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Magik
Represented By: Justin A. Brackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?