Halekulani Corporation v. Lei Hawaii Realty Inc.
Plaintiff: Halekulani Corporation
Defendant: Lei Hawaii Realty Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00085
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 41(a)(A)(i); APPROVED AS TO FORM by Halekulani Corporation - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. This action is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 41.1. There are no remaining claims, cross-claims, parties, and/or issues. (emt, )
March 13, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) Halekulani Corporation. (Chinen, Tracy)
March 2, 2020 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Re: Lei Hawaii Realty Inc. Acknowledgement filed by Halekulani Corporation., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Halekulani Corporation. Halekulani Corporation Lei Hawaii Realty, Inc. served on 2/27/2020. (Chinen, Tracy) Modified on 3/3/2020 (emt, ).
February 28, 2020 Filing 13 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake on the court's website. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO JENNIFER LEE TAYLOR re #9 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 2/25/2020. (emt, )
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO JULIANA I. FINLEY re #8 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 2/25/2020. (emt, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Halekulani Corporation [RE: 1) COMPLAINT FOR FEDERAL TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT, FEDERAL FALSE DESIGNATION OF ORIGIN, STATE TRADEMARK DILUTION, COMMON LAW TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT, STATE TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT, AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; EXHIBITS A-G; VERIFICATION; SUMMONS, filed February 21, 2020, and 2) PLAINTIFF HALEKULANI CORPORATIONS REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK, filed February 21, 2020] (Chinen, Tracy)
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer Lee Taylor Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2337863.Tracy G. Chinen appearing for Plaintiff Halekulani Corporation (Chinen, Tracy)
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Juliana I. Finley Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2337856.Tracy G. Chinen appearing for Plaintiff Halekulani Corporation (Chinen, Tracy)
February 24, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #1 Complaint and #2 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark shall be served by First Class Mail to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office at Mail Stop 8, Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, P. O. Box 1450, Alexandria, VA 22313-1450 on February 24, 2020. (emt, )
February 24, 2020 ADVISORY ENTRY. Exhibits Not Attached as Separate PDFS - Please be advised that the exhibits included in Document #1 Complaint filed by Halekulani Corporation are comprised of several exhibits and not submitted as separate pdf attachments. See Section 5.0 Exhibits, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide, for additional instructions on how to file exhibits as separate attachments to the main document. No further action is necessary. (emt, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 4/20/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Lei Hawaii Realty Inc. (emt, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00085 JAO-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Halekulani Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Mitsui Fudosan America, Inc. for Halekulani Corporation.. (Chinen, Tracy)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Halekulani Corporation PLAINTIFF HALEKULANI CORPORATIONS REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK Halekulani Corporation. (Chinen, Tracy)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FEDERAL TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT, FEDERAL FALSE DESIGNATION OF ORIGIN, STATE TRADEMARK DILUTION, COMMON LAW TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT, STATE TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT, AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; EXHIBITS A-G; VERIFICATION; SUMMONS against Lei Hawaii Realty Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2337217.), filed by Halekulani Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chinen, Tracy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halekulani Corporation v. Lei Hawaii Realty Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Halekulani Corporation
Represented By: Tracy G. Chinen
Represented By: Reginauld T. Harris
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Taylor
Represented By: Juliana I. Finley
Represented By: Alyssa N. E. Simbahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lei Hawaii Realty Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?