Godwin v. Guardian Capital Management Hawaii, LLC
Plaintiff: Gregory Godwin
Defendant: Guardian Capital Management Hawaii, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00098
Filed: March 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Guardian Capital Management Hawaii, LLC, filed by Gregory Godwin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Supplement Verification of Amended Complaint, #10 Certificate of Service)(Brackett, Justin) Docket Text Modified on 4/24/2020 (jo)
April 3, 2020 Filing 9 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for June 8, 2020 at 9:00 AM will be held by telephone. The Court will be using AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendant. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 04/28/2020 is CONTINUED to 6/08/2020 at 09:00AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Plaintiff shall notify Defendant of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory Godwin. Guardian Capital Management Hawaii, LLC served on 3/5/2020. (Brackett, Justin)
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Guardian Capital Management Hawaii, LLC (jo)
March 3, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 4/28/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
March 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 20-00098 HG-WRP on all further pleadings. (jo)
March 3, 2020 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin)
March 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages, Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Guardian Capital Management Hawaii, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2342032.), filed by Gregory Godwin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Declaration Verification of Complaint)(Brackett, Justin) Docket Text Modified on 3/3/2020 (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Godwin v. Guardian Capital Management Hawaii, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Capital Management Hawaii, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Godwin
Represented By: Justin A. Brackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?