The Arc In Hawaii, Inc., v. DB Insurance Co., Ltd formerly known as Dongbu Insurance Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: The Arc In Hawaii
Defendant: DB Insurance Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00112
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 12 Consent Election Form
May 8, 2020 Filing 11 Consent Election Form
April 3, 2020 Filing 10 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for May 26, 2020 at 9:15 AM will be held by telephone. The Court will be using AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
March 31, 2020 Filing 9 Defendant DB Insurance Co., Ltd.'s ANSWER to Complaint Filed February 12, 2020 by DB Insurance Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ching, Wesley)
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 04/13/2020 is CONTINUED to 5/26/2020 at 09:15AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
March 12, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Arc In Hawaii. (Goodin, Christopher)
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DB Insurance Co., Ltd. re #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Certificate of Service Re: Notice of Removal Filed 03/10/20 (Kon-Herrera, Sheree)
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DB Insurance Co., Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Republic of Korea for DB Insurance Co., Ltd (Kon-Herrera, Sheree) Docket Text Modified on 3/11/2020 (jo)
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jo)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 4/13/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 20-00112 WRP on all further pleadings. (jo)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DB Insurance Co., Ltd formerly known as Dongbu Insurance Co., Ltd. from In the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, case number 1CCV-20-0000223. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2345648), filed by DB Insurance Co., Ltd formerly known as Dongbu Insurance Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(Ching, Wesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Arc In Hawaii, Inc., v. DB Insurance Co., Ltd formerly known as Dongbu Insurance Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DB Insurance Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Sheree A. Kon-Herrera
Represented By: Wesley H.H. Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Arc In Hawaii
Represented By: Keith Y. Yamada
Represented By: Christopher T. Goodin
Represented By: Kirk M. Neste
Represented By: Justin M. Luney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?