Gregory v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jimmie Andre Gregory
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv00114
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS; ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 4/14/2020. No later than June 15, 2020, Defendant shall file a Status Report regarding the status of the certified administrative record. (jo)
April 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Talbert on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Talbert, Daniel)
April 13, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Stay of Proceedings by Andrew M. Saul. (Talbert, Daniel)
April 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel S. Moriyama on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Moriyama, Rachel)
April 6, 2020 Filing 9 Consent Election Form
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from the Clerk's Office to Diane C. Haar, Esq., re: #6 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES AND COSTS, dated March 12, 2020 (jo)
March 12, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul (jo)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS re: #3 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 3/12/2020. (jo)
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form : Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00114 WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Diane C. Haar appearing for Plaintiff Jimmie Andre Gregory (Haar, Diane)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Haar, Diane)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Review of Social Security Disability and Supplemental Security Income Benefits Determinations against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Jimmie Andre Gregory. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haar, Diane) Modified on 3/11/2020 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Daniel P. Talbert
Represented By: Rachel S. Moriyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Andre Gregory
Represented By: Diane C. Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?