Thompson Metal Fab, Inc. v. Zurich American Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Thompson Metal Fab, Inc.
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Co.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00126
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 10 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for September 21, 2020 at 09:00AM will be held by telephone. The Court will be using AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 EO: Based on #8 LETTER, the Court grants the request to continue the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference from May 18, 2020 to September 21, 2020 at 09:00AM before JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendant. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
April 27, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from Robert K. Fricke addressed to Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter, dated April 24, 2020. (mrf)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for May 18, 2020 at 9:00 AM will be held by telephone. The Court will be using AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. Counsel for Plaintiff shall inform Defendant. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Zurich American Insurance Co. (jni, )
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00 AM on 5/18/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00126 HG-WRP on all further pleadings. (jni)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thompson Metal Fab, Inc.. (Fricke, Robert)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zurich American Insurance Co. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2349740.), filed by Thompson Metal Fab, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Zurich Payment Bond, #2 Exhibit B-Fence Purchase Order, #3 Exhibit C-Framing Purchase Order, #4 Exhibit D-Modified Fence Purchase Order, #5 Exhibit E-Modified Framing Purchase Order, #6 Exhibit F-05.22.19 Claim Update Letter, #7 Exhibit G-05.22.19 Letter to Zurich, #8 Exhibit H-05.24.19 Letter to Zurich, #9 Exhibit I-06.04.19 Zurich Response, #10 Exhibit J-Transmission of Proof of Claim, #11 Exhibit K-09.23.19 Letter from Zurich, #12 Summons, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fricke, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson Metal Fab, Inc. v. Zurich American Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thompson Metal Fab, Inc.
Represented By: Abigail Marie Holden
Represented By: Robert K. Fricke
Represented By: Joachim P. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?