Durrett v. Longs Drugs Stores
Plaintiff: Angela Lynn Durrett and Chad Ikona Labra
Defendant: Doe Non-Profit Organizations 1-10, John Does 1 - 10, Doe Limited Liability Companies 1-10, Roe Government Agencies 1-10, Doe Trusts 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, Longs Drug Stores California, LLC, Doe Corporations 1-10 and Doe Partnerships 1-10
Case Number: 1:2020cv00144
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER; EXHIBIT "A" - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 5/22/2020. (jni)
May 13, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Longs Drug Stores California, LLC (Re: Defendant Longs Drugs Stores California, L.L.C., dba Longs Drugs #9956's Initial Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP Rule 26) (Meyer, John-Anderson)
May 13, 2020 Filing 13 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Angela Lynn Durrett. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Miyashita, Robert)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Rule 16 Scheduling Order - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 5/4/2020. (jni)
May 4, 2020 Filing 11 EP: TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held. Dates given. Court to prepare Scheduling Order. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 08/24/2021 at 9:00 a.m. in Aha Kaulike before JUDGE ALAN C. KAY. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 07/13/2021 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Early Settlement Conference is set for 07/06/2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 05/17/2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 03/24/2021. Discovery due by 06/25/2021. (No Record 9:42 - 9:48.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
May 1, 2020 Filing 10 EO: Pursuant to the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's April 16, 2020 Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency, the #5 Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 05/04/2020 will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 Scheduling Conference Statement of Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Miyashita, Robert)
April 27, 2020 Filing 8 Scheduling Conference Statement Defendant Longs Drug Stores California, LLC dba Longs Drugs #9956's Scheduling Conference Statement; Certificate of Service. (Meyer, John-Anderson)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Planning Meeting (Joint). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Miyashita, Robert)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Longs Drug Stores California, LLC re #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Answer to Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal, AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Meyer, John-Anderson)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30 AM on 5/4/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00144 ACK-KJM on all further pleadings. (jni)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Longs Drugs Stores identifying Corporate Parent Longs Drug Stores, LLC, Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc. for Longs Drugs Stores.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Meyer, John-Anderson)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Longs Drugs Stores. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Meyer, John-Anderson)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Longs Drugs Stores from First Circuit Court, case number CV-20-0000430. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2354478), filed by Longs Drugs Stores. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie K. Luker, #2 Declaration of John-Anderson L. Meyer, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Certificate of Service, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, (Meyer, John-Anderson) Modified on 4/2/2020 (jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durrett v. Longs Drugs Stores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Non-Profit Organizations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Limited Liability Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Government Agencies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Trusts 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Longs Drug Stores California, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Jonathan Cheng
Represented By: John-Anderson L. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Lynn Durrett
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Robert Saburo Miyashita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Ikona Labra
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Robert Saburo Miyashita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?