Demoruelle v. Rao et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Lee Demoruelle
Defendant: Andrew R. Wheeler, William A. Kucharski, Katherine Rao, David Albright, Bruce Anderson, Sina Pruder, Dora Beck and Deanna Sako
Case Number: 1:2020cv00147
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Sinclair Salas-Ferguson on behalf of Dora Beck, William A. Kucharski, Deanna Sako on behalf of Dora Beck, William A. Kucharski, Deanna Sako. (Salas-Ferguson, Sinclair)
June 1, 2020 Filing 21 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE not held.Parties agree this matter seeks review of administrative record. Plaintiff confirms there are no state claims alleged in this action. Mr. Bohlen for State defendants, and Mr. Horowitz for County defendants, report service not yet made. As to Federal defendants, Ms. Walker represents motion to dismiss likely as to Defendants Rao and Albright. Court CONTINUES Rule 16 Scheduling Conference to 07/02/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. Parties directed to meet and confer as to the following: 1. Service of remaining parties; 2. Scope/definition of administrative record; 3. Dismissal of Federal Defendants Rao and Albright; and 4. Proposed schedule for lodging administrative record and briefing. (FTR-Ctrm AT&T Conference Call (9:19 - 9:30).) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 1, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Devin K. Horowitz on behalf of Dora Beck, William A. Kucharski, Deanna Sako on behalf of Dora Beck, William A. Kucharski, Deanna Sako. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Horowitz, Devin)
June 1, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Devin K. Horowitz on behalf of William A. Kucharski on behalf of William A. Kucharski. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Horowitz, Devin)
May 29, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward G. Bohlen on behalf of Bruce Anderson, Sina Pruder on behalf of Bruce Anderson, Sina Pruder. (Bohlen, Edward)
May 27, 2020 Filing 17 EO: In accordance with the Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency, issued on April 16, 2020 by Chief District Judge Seabright, until further court order or notice, all proceedings before Magistrate Judge Trader will be conducted by telephone or other electronic means. Call-in information for the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 06/01/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. Participants to call in per the instructions below:1. Dial 1-888-363-47352. Enter Access Code (2070326) when prompted followed by the pound (#) sign.3. Message will say "To join the conference as host press star (*) otherwise press pound (#).4. Press pound (#). Message will say "The host has not yet arrived, please standby".5. You will hear "At the tone state your name." You will then be connected to the Conference. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 24, 2020 Filing 16 Scheduling Conference Statement for Federal Defendants. (Walker, Davene)
May 22, 2020 Filing 15 Plaintiff's Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Mailing Envelope)(jni)
May 22, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Davene D. Walker on behalf of David Albright, Katherine Rao, Andrew R. Wheeler on behalf of David Albright, Katherine Rao, Andrew R. Wheeler. (Walker, Davene)
May 21, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed Bruce Anderson served on 5/11/2020 by Certified Mail. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(jni)
May 21, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Sina Pruder served on 5/11/2020 by Certified Mail. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(jni)
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Bruce Anderson. (jni)
May 5, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Sina Pruder. (jni)
May 5, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION; PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION; DECLARATION OF JEROME WARREN; TABLE AND EXHIBITS A- K, against All Defendants, filed by Sandra Lee Demoruelle. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Lieu of Affidavit in Support of Injunction, #2 Declaration in Lieu of Affidavit of Jerome Warren, #3 Exhibit Table, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Certificate of Service, #16 Mailing Envelope)(jni)
April 27, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed William P. Barr, United States Attorney General, served on 4/20/2020 - Served via Certified mail. (jni)
April 27, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed United States Attorney, District of Hawaii, served on 4/15/2020 - Served via Certified mail. (jni)
April 27, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Mayor Harry Kim, County of Hawaii, served on 4/15/2020 - Served via Certified mail. (jni)
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Andrew R. Wheeler served on 4/20/2020 - Served via Certified Mail. (jjt)
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Katherine Rao served on 4/21/2020 - Served via Certified mail. (jjt)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00 AM on 6/1/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER -Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements)(jni)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number HI028500), filed by Sandra Lee Demoruelle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Katherine Rao, #3 Mailing Envelope)(jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demoruelle v. Rao et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew R. Wheeler
Represented By: Davene D. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A. Kucharski
Represented By: Devin K. Horowitz
Represented By: Sinclair Salas-Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Rao
Represented By: Davene D. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Albright
Represented By: Davene D. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Anderson
Represented By: Edward G. Bohlen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sina Pruder
Represented By: Edward G. Bohlen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dora Beck
Represented By: Devin K. Horowitz
Represented By: Sinclair Salas-Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna Sako
Represented By: Devin K. Horowitz
Represented By: Sinclair Salas-Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Lee Demoruelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?