Aoren Endeavors LLC. v. HiGear Design, Inc.
Plaintiff: Aoren Endeavors LLC.
Defendant: John Mittelstadt and HiGear Design, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00182
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Filing 13 Scheduling Conference Statement (Amended Joint Statement). (Gray, Steven)
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 EO: In accordance with the Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency, issued on June 1, 2020, the Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 06/22/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader will be conducted by telephone. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference/hearing. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-47352. Enter Access Code (2070326) when prompted followed by the pound (#) sign.3. Message will say "To join the conference as host press star (*) otherwise press pound (#).4. Press pound (#). Message will say "The host has not yet arrived, please standby."5. You will hear "At the tone state your name." You will then be connected to the Conference. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Planning Meeting (Joint Report). (Gray, Steven)
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 Scheduling Conference Statement (Joint Statement). (Gray, Steven)
June 2, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aoren Endeavors LLC.. HiGear Design, Inc. waiver sent on 5/22/2020, answer due 7/21/2020; John Mittelstadt waiver sent on 5/22/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (Gray, Steven)
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aoren Endeavors LLC.. (Gray, Steven)
April 23, 2020 Filing 7 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS: Plaintiff's Counsel, please complete the attached AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. Please submit to the Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii using the filing event "Notice (Other)". The Clerk will transmit the AO 120 Report to the U.S. Copyright Office. (jni)
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants HiGear Design, Inc. (jni) Docket text modified on 4/24/2020 (emt, ).
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00 AM on 6/22/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00182 LEK-RT on all further pleadings. (jni)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Gray, Steven)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Jury Demand) against HiGear Design, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2362424.), filed by Aoren Endeavors LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gray, Steven) Modified on 4/24/2020 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aoren Endeavors LLC. v. HiGear Design, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aoren Endeavors LLC.
Represented By: Steven R. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mittelstadt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HiGear Design, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?