Scutt v. Kaiser Permanente Wailuku Medical Office et al
Plaintiff: Jason Scutt
Defendant: Maui Memorial Hospital, Kaiser Permanente Wailuku Medical Office and Kaiser Permanente Wailuku Medical Clinics
Case Number: 1:2020cv00187
Filed: April 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #63 MOTION to Compel TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS [DKT. 63], FILED AUGUST 18, 2021; filed by Kaiser Permanente Wailuku Medical Clinics. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Maegan A. Ruggles, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Certificate of Service)(Ruggles, Maegan)
August 29, 2021 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - filed by Jason Scutt Re: Plaintiff's Supplemental requests Interrogatories and Rule 34 Document Requests (jo)
August 29, 2021 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - filed by Jason Scutt Re: Plaintiff's Response to Interrogatories and Rule 34 Document Requests (jo)
August 29, 2021 Filing 66 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Objections to Compel Discovery; Exhibit A; Certificate of Service re: #60 - filed by Jason Scutt (jo)
August 27, 2021 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #60 MOTION to Compel MOTION to Amend/Correct COMPEL DISCOVERY OF WITNESSES AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND filed by Kaiser Permanente Wailuku Medical Clinics. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Maegan A. Ruggles, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Certificate of Service)(Ruggles, Maegan)
August 23, 2021 Filing 64 EO: Under Rule 45(d)(2)(B)(ii), the Court construes Plaintiff's Response to Discovery Objections, ECF No. #63 , as a motion to compel compliance with the subpoenas at issue. No later than 9/7/2021, Defendant shall file a response. No later than 9/24/2021, Plaintiff shall file a reply. Thereafter, the Court will determine whether to set the matter for a telephonic hearing or decide the matter without a hearing. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 18, 2021 Filing 63 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Discovery Objections re #62 - filed by Jason Scutt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(jni) Modified on 8/23/2021 (jo)
August 18, 2021 Filing 62 OBJECTION DEFENDANTS RULE 45 OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS SUBPOENA DUCES TECUMS AND NOTICES OF DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN EXAMINATION, ISSUED AUGUST 9, 2021; filed by Kaiser Permanente Wailuku Medical Clinics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Certificate of Service)(Ruggles, Maegan)
August 16, 2021 Filing 61 EO: Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(c), the Court elects to decide Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery of Witnesses and Request for Leave to Amend, ECF No. #60 , without a hearing. Briefing shall be in accordance with Local Rule 7.2. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Jason Scutt has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 13, 2021 Filing 60 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Discovery of Witnesses and REQUEST for Leave to Amend; Exhibit A - News Article; Certificate of Service - by Plaintiff Jason Scutt. (emt, )
August 13, 2021 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kaiser Permanente Wailuku Medical Clinics [Re: (1) Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, dated July 15, 2021, and (2) Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set of Rule 34 Document Requests, dated July 16, 2021, Dated August 13, 2021] (Ruggles, Maegan)
August 9, 2021 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - filed by Jason Scutt (jo)
August 6, 2021 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kaiser Permanente Wailuku Medical Clinics [RE: (1) DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF JASON SCUTT, DATED AUGUST 6, 2021 AND (2) DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS TO PLAINTIFF JASON SCUTT, DATED AUGUST 6, 2021] (Ruggles, Maegan)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR PERMISSION TO PARTICIPATE IN ELECTRONIC FILING re #55 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/6/2021. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - All parties served electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
August 4, 2021 Filing 55 APPLICATION For Permission to Participate in Electronic Filing (E-File) (Pro Se Non-Prisoner) - filed by Plaintiff Jason Scutt (jo)
August 4, 2021 Filing 54 Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Consent to Receive Documents and Notices of Electronic Filing by Email - filed by Jason Scutt (Attachments: #1 Technical Guide for Using NEFs) (jo)
July 19, 2021 Filing 53 EO: On 7/16/2021, Plaintiff filed a Request for Leave to Depose More Than 10 Witnesses, ECF No. #51 . Any party seeking to exceed Rule 30(a)(2)'s ten-deposition limit "must make a particularized showing of why the discovery is necessary." Finazzo v. Hawaiian Airlines, 2007 WL 1425241, at *3 (D. Haw. May 10, 2007). Generally, courts do not grant leave to take additional depositions until the ten-deposition limit has been exhausted. Id. ("Rule 30(a)(2)(A) clearly contemplates that a party has already taken ten depositions before a motion is filed seeking leave of court for a proposed deposition that would result in more than ten depositions being taken under this rule."). Additionally, the moving party generally must exhaust less expensive and burdensome means of discovery before seeking leave to take additional depositions. Id. Here, it does not appear that Plaintiff has taken any depositions or exhausted other less expensive and less burdensome means of discovery as to the witnesses at issue. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Request is DENIED without prejudice to refiling after she has already taken ten deposition and has exhausted other less expensive and less burdensome means of discovery. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Jason Scutt has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 16, 2021 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE: Plaintiff's First Set of Rule 34 Document Requests - filed by Jason Scutt (jo)
July 16, 2021 Filing 51 Plaintiff's REQUEST For Leave to Depose More Than 10 Witnesses; Certificate of Service - filed by Plaintiff Jason Scutt (jo)
July 15, 2021 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - filed by Jason Scutt Re: Plaintiff's First Set of Interragatories [sic](jo)
July 6, 2021 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kaiser Permanente Wailuku Medical Clinics [Re: Defendant's Initial Disclosures] (Ruggles, Maegan)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL re: #38 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 7/1/2021. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Jason Scutt has been served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 25, 2021 Filing 47 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Change of Address - filed by Jason Scutt (jo)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 6/22/2021. Pursuant to LR 16.5(b), all parties to this matter are ORDERED TO APPEAR for a confidential settlement conference, on March 31, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Jason Scutt has been served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 6/22/2021. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Jason Scutt has been served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 22, 2021 Filing 44 EP: TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCEThe Court held a Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. A Rule 16 Scheduling Order to be issued.Discussion held regarding consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 08:30 AM on 6/21/2022 before SENIOR JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 6/9/2022 at 10:30 AM before SENIOR JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 5/10/2022 at 10:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference is set for 3/31/2022 at 10:00 AM by Video Teleconference before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. The Court will provide details regarding VTC prior to the conference date. Confidential Settlement Conference statements due by 3/24/2022. Dispositive Motions filed by 1/19/2022. Discovery due by 4/22/2022. (ATT / 9:05 - 9:18) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Jason Scutt has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 15, 2021 Filing 43 Scheduling Conference Statement DEFENDANTS RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ruggles, Maegan)
June 7, 2021 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Jury Demand [Dkt. 38], Filed on May 28, 2021 filed by Kaiser Permanente Wailuku Medical Clinics. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Counsel, #2 Certificate of Service)(Ruggles, Maegan)
June 3, 2021 Filing 41 REPORT of Planning Meeting and Certificate of Service. (Ruggles, Maegan)
June 1, 2021 Filing 40 EO: Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(c), the Court elects to decide Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Demand for Jury Trial, ECF No. #38 , without a hearing. Briefing shall be in accordance with Local Rule 7.2. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 6/1/2021 (jp).
May 28, 2021 Filing 39 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Kaiser Permanente Wailuku Medical Clinics. DEFENDANT KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.S (erroneously named as KAISER PERMANENTE WAILUKU MEDICAL CLINICS) AMENDED DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ruggles, Maegan)
May 28, 2021 Filing 38 Plaintiff's Memoarandum [sic] in Opposition to Defendant's Demand For Jury Trial; MOTION to Strike; Certificate of Service re: #36 - filed by Plaintiff Jason Scutt (jo)
May 27, 2021 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kaiser Permanente Wailuku Medical Clinics identifying Corporate Parent Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. for Kaiser Permanente Wailuku Medical Clinics.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ruggles, Maegan)
May 27, 2021 Filing 36 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ruggles, Maegan)
May 27, 2021 Filing 35 Defendant's ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint Filed June 7, 2020 by Kaiser Permanente Wailuku Medical Clinics. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ruggles, Maegan)
May 21, 2021 Filing 34 Plaintiff's Conference of Parties' Joint Statement; Certificate of Service - filed by Jason Scutt (jo)
May 21, 2021 Filing 33 Plaintiff's Rule 16 Conference Statement; Certificate of Service - filed by Jason Scutt (jo)
May 21, 2021 Filing 32 Plaintiff's Rule 26 DISCLOSURES; Certificate of Service - filed by Jason Scutt (jo)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT re: #27 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 5/17/2021. Defendant's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint and for More Definite Statement is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as detailed above. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 6/22/2021 at 9:00 a.m. before the undersigned via AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296, Access Code 8224751. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Jason Scutt will be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 12, 2021 Filing 30 REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION to Strike #11 Amended Complaint and For More Definite Statement filed April 9, 2021 filed by Kaiser Permanente Wailuku Medical Clinics. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ruggles, Maegan) Modified on 5/12/2021 (jo)
April 28, 2021 Filing 29 Plaintiff's MEMOARANDUM [sic] in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike Information re: #27 - filed by Jason Scutt (jo)
April 12, 2021 Filing 28 EO: Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(c), the Court elects to decide Defendant's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint and for More Definitive Statement, ECF No. #27 , without a hearing and DIRECTS briefing as follows: Plaintiff shall file a response no later than 4/30/2021; Defendant shall file a reply no later than 5/14/2021. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 9, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION to Strike #11 Amended Complaint and For More Definite Statement Maegan Arlene Wilber Ruggles appearing for Defendant Kaiser Permanente Wailuku Medical Clinics (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Counsel, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Certificate of Service)(Ruggles, Maegan)
March 29, 2021 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Kaiser Permanente Wailuku Medical Clinics served on 3/19/2021 (jo)
March 29, 2021 Filing 25 Process Receipt and Return - USM 285 served in person by Marshals service on 3/19/2021 re: #17 Summons Issued as to Kaiser Permanente Wailuku Medical Clinics (jo)
January 17, 2021 Filing 24 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Change of Address - filed by Jason Scutt (jo)
November 12, 2020 Filing 23 Plaintiff's CASE STATUS - filed by Jason Scutt (jo)
November 6, 2020 Filing 22 EO: On July 31, 2020, the Court issued its Order Directing Service of the Second Amended Complaint in which the Court directed the Clerk's Office to send to Plaintiff copies of the forms necessary for the U.S. Marshal to effect service. See ECF No. #16 . Further, the Court order that Plaintiff was to complete the forms as directed, including addresses and any other pertinent information required for service, and submit all of the documents to the U.S. Marshal in Honolulu, Hawaii. See id. The Clerk's Office mailed copies of the forms as directed to Plaintiff's address of record on July 31, 2020, and also to Plaintiff's updated address of record on August 11, 2020. See ECF Nos. #19 , #21 .To date, the U.S. Marshal has not received the completed forms from Plaintiff. No later than December 6, 2020, Plaintiff shall submit the required completed forms to the U.S. Marshal in Honolulu, Hawaii and shall file a Status Report with the Court to confirm the submission. Plaintiff's failure to submit the required completed forms to the U.S. Marshal and/or failure to file a Status Report as directed may result in dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute or otherwise follow a court order. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b); Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m); see also In re Sheehan, 253 F.3d 507, 513 (9th Cir. 2001). (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 10, 2020 Filing 21 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (re #16 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT). Mail sent to Jason Scutt at 950 Wailupe Dr., Wailuku, HI 96793 returned undeliverable. The Clerk's Office will resend the Order and service documents to the Plaintiff at 281 Kaikea Street, Kihei, HI 96753 on August 11, 2020. Note: Pursuant to the Order and described in the Clerk's Letter, two copies of the following documents were included in the undelivered mail: Second Amended Complaint, summons issued, Civil Waiver of Service Packet and USM-285 forms. To avoid duplicate scanned images, only one set of each document was appended to the this entry. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Letter, dated July 31, 2020, #2 Order Directing Service of Second Amended Complaint, #3 Second Amended Complaint, #4 Summons issued, #5 Civil Waiver of Service Packet, #6 USM-285 form) (emt, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 20 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Change of Address - filed by Jason Scutt (jo)
July 31, 2020 Filing 19 Letter from the Clerks' Office to Plaintiff Jason Scutt re ECF No. #16 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, dated July 31, 2020. (emt, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 18 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Kaiser Permanente Wailuku Medical Clinics. (emt, )
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 7/31/2020. (emt, )
July 31, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #16 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT has been served by First Class Mail to Jason Scutt at the address of record on July 31, 2020. The forms and/or documents for service identified in the Clerks' Letter were included in the mailing to the Plaintiff. The Order was served to the U.S. Marshals Service by email on July 31, 2020. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION THAT THE DISTRICT COURT DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IN PART (ECF No. #13 ) - Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 7/30/2020. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Jason Scutt will be served by First Class Mail on July 31, 2020 to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 30, 2020 Filing 14 Plaintiff's Notification of Acceptances of Court's Alternative Option - filed by Jason Scutt (jo)
June 25, 2020 Filing 13 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION THAT THE DISTRICT COURT DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IN PART - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 6/25/2020. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Jason Scutt will be served by First Class Mail on June 26, 2020 to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION THAT THE DISTRICT COURT DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND (ECF No. #10 ) - Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 6/24/2020. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 7, 2020 Filing 11 Plaintiff's SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kaiser Permanente Wailuku Medical Clinics - filed by Jason Scutt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (jo)
June 4, 2020 Filing 10 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION THAT THE DISTRICT COURT DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 6/4/2020. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION THAT THE DISTRICT COURT GRANT PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES AND DISMISS THE COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND (ECF No. #6 ) - Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 5/18/2020. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Jason Scutt will be served by First Class Mail on May 18, 2020 to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 3, 2020 Filing 8 Plaintiff's FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Jason Scutt Document also includes a Motion to Seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (jo)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL re: #3 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 4/28/2020. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Jason Scutt will be served by First Class Mail on April 29, 2020 to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 28, 2020 Filing 6 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION THAT THE DISTRICT COURT GRANT PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES AND DISMISS THE COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 4/28/2020. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Jason Scutt will be served by First Class Mail on April 29, 2020 to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 (Proposed) Summons as to Defendant Maui Memorial Hosptial - by Jason Scutt (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Waiver of Service) (jo)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 (Proposed) Summons as to Defendant Kaiser Permanente Wailuku Medical Office - by Jason Scutt (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Waiver of Service) (jo)
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST For Appointment of Counsel Under the Civil Rights Act of 1964; 42 U.S.C. 2000e-5(f)(l)(B); Declaration In Support of Request - filed by Plaintiff Jason Scutt (jo)
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION To Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form) - filed by Plaintiff Jason Scutt (jo)
April 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For A Civil Case Alleging Negligence against All Defendants - filed by Jason Scutt (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scutt v. Kaiser Permanente Wailuku Medical Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Scutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maui Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Wailuku Medical Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Wailuku Medical Clinics
Represented By: Maegan Arlene Wilber Ruggles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?