Yamauchi vs. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Charlotte A. Yamauchi and James T. Yamauchi, Jr.
Defendant: Bayer Corporation, Kailua Hardware, Limited and Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00199
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 EO: Because this action has been transferred to the multi-district litigation pending in the Northern District of California, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 6/1/2020 is vacated. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
May 19, 2020 Filing 12 EO: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal of Kailua Hardware, sent May 15, 2020. This action has been transferred to the multi-district litigation pending in the Northern District of California. ECF Nos. #10 , #11 . Because this action has been transferred, jurisdiction lies with the Northern District of California and this Court will take no action regarding the submitted Notice. See In re Phenylpropanolamine (PPA) Prod. Liab. Litig., 460 F.3d 1217, 1230 (9th Cir. 2006) ("When the transfer becomes effective, the jurisdiction of the transferor court ceases and the transferee court has exclusive jurisdiction." (internal quotation marks and citation omitted)). SO ORDERED by (JUDGE ALAN C. KAY)(il, )
May 15, 2020 ADVISORY ENTRY: Please be advised that pursuant to LR41.1, docket entry #9 Notice of Dismissal, requires the Judge's signature. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the document in Microsoft Word format to the applicable chambers' email address. See Section 10.4 - Emailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations to Chambers, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide for additional instructions and a list of judge's email addresses. (jni)
May 15, 2020 Filing 11 TEXT ENTRY ORDER re #10 (UNCERTIFIED) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO - 209), MDL NO. 2741, Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the PanelAs stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer.The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. California for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. (jni)
May 15, 2020 Filing 10 (UNCERTIFIED) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO - 209), MDL NO. 2741, Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the PanelPursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of October 3, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria.This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. The transmittal of this order to said Clerk shall be stayed 7 days from the entry thereof. If any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this 7-day period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel. (jni)
May 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Dismissal for Kailua Hardware, Limited James T. Yamauchi, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mackintosh, Brian)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT BAYER CORPORATION - Signed by JUDGE ALAN C. KAY on 5/6/2020. (jni)
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, 1CCV190002065. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Certificate, #2 Case Detail Docket List) (jni)
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 EO: The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 06/01/2020 at 9:00AM is ADVANCED to 08:45AM, the same day, before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. The Court will be using AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/1/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO R: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00199 ACK-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Monsanto Company. (Meyer, John-Anderson)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Monsanto Company.. (Melchinger, Glenn)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Monsanto Company from First Circuit Court, case number Civil No. 19-1-1691-10. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2365702), filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bayer Consent, #2 Declaration of John-Anderson L. Meyer, #3 Exhibit A - Docket, #4 Exhibit B - Mackintosh email, #5 Certificate of Service)(Meyer, John-Anderson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yamauchi vs. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kailua Hardware, Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Paul Alston
Represented By: Glenn T. Melchinger
Represented By: John-Anderson L. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte A. Yamauchi
Represented By: Brian Keith Mackintosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James T. Yamauchi, Jr.
Represented By: Brian Keith Mackintosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?