Sullivan v. MacPherson et al
Plaintiff: Leihinahina Sullivan
Defendant: Rebecca A. Perlmutter, Mark MacPherson, John Does 1-100, Kenji Price, Department of Treasury, U.S. Department of Justice, Internal Revenue Service and Office of the U.S. Attorney, District of Hawaii
Case Number: 1:2020cv00248
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
2 Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 12:3410
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a filed stamped copy of #8 Amended Complaint will be served by First Class Mail on July 15, 2020 to Leihinahina Sullivan at the addresses of record. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (jo)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT Violation of Right To Financial Privacy Act ("RFDA") 12 U.S.C. 3401-3422; Damages Pursuant to 12 U.S.C. 3401 against All Defendants - filed by Leihinahina Sullivan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address - filed by Leihinahina Sullivan (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Leihinahina Sullivan will served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION re: #5 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 6/16/2020. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Leihinahina Sullivan will be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on June 17, 2020. A copy of the order will be served by First Class Mail to the Warden and Financial Office at FDC-Honolulu and the Bureau of Prisons on June 17, 2020. USDC Financial Department will receive the Order electronically.
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION To Proceed In Forma Pauperis By A Prisoner - filed by Plaintiff Leihinahina Sullivan (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/1/2020. Case reassigned to CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT for all further proceedings. JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 20-00248 JMS-KJM on all further pleadings . (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Leihinahina Sullivan served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on June 1, 2020.
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 5/29/2020. JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON for all further proceedings. Please reflect case number CV 20-00248 DKW-KJM on all further filings . (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Leihinahina Sullivan shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on June 1, 2020.
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/28/2020. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Leihinahina Sullivan shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on June 1, 2020. A file-stamped copy of the Complaint and a copy of the Court's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner form and instructions shall be included in the mailing to Ms. Sullivan.
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 Initial COMPLAINT (Notice) Violation of Financial Privacy Act ("RFDA") 12 U.S.C. 3401-3422, Sullivan's Due Process of Law - Equal Protection Rights; Request for Award of Damages Allowable Under 12 U.S.C. 3417(a) and for Disciplinary Action for Willful or Intentional Violations by Defendants against All Defendants - filed by Leihinahina Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. MacPherson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca A. Perlmutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark MacPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenji Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the U.S. Attorney, District of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leihinahina Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?