Massachusetts Bay Insurance Co. et al v. Arcadia Architectural Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Co. and Hanover Insurance Company
Defendant: Arcadia Architectural Products, Inc., Arcadia Inc. and Association of Apartment Owners of Poipu Point
Case Number: 1:2020cv00284
Filed: June 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/23/2020. ( Status Conference - MJ is set for 9/21/2020 09:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER.) (emt, )
June 23, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: The Clerk of Court for the U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii gives notice of its receipt of the electronic record for Civil Case 3:19-cv-01987-VAB, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Co., et al. v. Arcadia Architectural Products, Inc., et al., transferred from the U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut (New Haven). Please be advised that Senior U.S. District Judge Helen Gillmor and U.S. Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter are assigned to this case. Please reflect Civil Case No. CV 20-00284 HG-WRP on all further filings in this case. Submission of Pro Hac Vice Applications: Please refer to LR83.1(e) of the Local Rules for the District of Hawaii with respect to the submission of applications for pro hac vice admittance and the designation of local counsel (a member in good standing of the bar of this court who maintains an office within this district). The "Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Declaration of Counsel Package" (form HID007-007a) are available on the court's website, www.hid.uscourts.gov. The filing fees is $300.00 per attorney, per case. (emt, )
June 23, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00284 HG-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
June 23, 2020 Filing 31 Case transferred in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:19-cv-01987. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 16, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Perez, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Transfer to Another District. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii.Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/15/2020. (Leon, Noel) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 29 Joint MOTION to Transfer to Another District by Hanover Insurance Company, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Co.. (Williams, Christopher) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time until June 15, 2020, for Plaintiffs to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss/Transfer. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/5/2020. (Leon, Noel) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 27 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint for Failure to Join an Indispensable Party [FRCP 12(b)(7)] Or In The Alternative, to Transfer for Convenience [28 U.S.C. 1404(a)] Or In The Alternative, Stay the Proceedings Pending Reso until June 15, 2020 by Hanover Insurance Company, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Co.. (Williams, Christopher) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time until June 8, 2020 for Plaintiffs to respond to the Motion to Dismiss/Transfer. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/20/2020. (Leon, Noel) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 25 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until June 8, 2020 to Respond to Motion to Dismiss/Transfer #19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint for Failure to Join an Indispensable Party [FRCP 12(b)(7)] Or In The Alternative, to Transfer for Convenience [28 U.S.C. 1404(a)] Or In The Alternative, Stay the Proceedings Pending Reso by Hanover Insurance Company, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Co.. (Williams, Christopher) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time until May 25, 2020 for Plaintiffs to respond to the Motion to Dismiss/Transfer #19 . Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/5/2020. (Leon, Noel) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 25, 2020 Respond to Motion to Dismiss #19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint for Failure to Join an Indispensable Party [FRCP 12(b)(7)] Or In The Alternative, to Transfer for Convenience [28 U.S.C. 1404(a)] Or In The Alternative, Stay the Proceedings Pending Reso by Hanover Insurance Company, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Co.. (Williams, Christopher) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Post-Discovery Telephonic Status Conference set for December 10, 2020, at 11:30 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at 203-579-5562. (Leon, Noel) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER:Joinder of additional parties by July 24, 2020 ;Discovery complete by December 4, 2020 ;Post-Discovery Telephonic Status Conference December 10, 2020, at 11:30 a.m. ;Dispositive motions due January 8, 2021 ;Joint Trial Memorandum due February 5, 2021, (or 30 days after the Court rules on any dispositive motions);Trial Ready date March 8, 2021, (or 30 days after submission of the Joint Trial Memorandum).Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/24/2020. (Leon, Noel) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Williams, Christopher) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint for Failure to Join an Indispensable Party [FRCP 12(b)(7)] Or In The Alternative, to Transfer for Convenience [28 U.S.C. 1404(a)] Or In The Alternative, Stay the Proceedings Pending Resolution of the Underlying Action by Arcadia Architectural Products, Inc., Arcadia, Inc..Responses due by 5/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Barry MacNaughton, Esq., #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Ostrowski, Mark) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Arcadia Architectural Products, Inc. to 4/19/2020; Arcadia, Inc. to 4/19/2020. (Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time until April 19, 2020, for Defendants to respond to the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/23/20. (Leon, Noel) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Dlugoszewski on behalf of Arcadia Architectural Products, Inc., Arcadia, Inc. (Dlugoszewski, Sarah) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 04/19/2020 to Respond to Second Amended Complaint by Arcadia Architectural Products, Inc., Arcadia, Inc.. (Ostrowski, Mark) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Kean Ostrowski on behalf of Arcadia Architectural Products, Inc., Arcadia, Inc. (Ostrowski, Mark) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 Amended Complaint by Hanover Insurance Company, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Co..Responses due by 2/28/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Racicot, Tara) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Hanover Insurance Company, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Co.. (Racicot, Tara) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Hanover Insurance Company, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Co.. (Racicot, Tara) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Association of Apartment Owners of Poipu Point Only by Hanover Insurance Company, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Co. (Racicot, Tara) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #9 Protective Order, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Hanover Insurance Company, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Massachusetts Bay Insurance Co., #1 Complaint filed by Hanover Insurance Company, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Co., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Hanover Insurance Company, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Co., #8 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Hanover Insurance Company, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Co., #6 Amended Complaint filed by Hanover Insurance Company, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Co. Signed by Clerk on 12/19/2019. (Fanelle, N.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Massachusetts Bay Insurance Co., Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Williams, Christopher) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/18/2019. (Fanelle, N.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/18/2019. (Fanelle, N.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/16/2020 Discovery due by 6/18/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 7/23/2020 Signed by Clerk on 12/18/2019. (Fanelle, N.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Anastasio, F.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Massachusetts Bay Insurance Co.. (Williams, Christopher) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hanover Insurance Company. (Williams, Christopher) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Frances Racicot on behalf of Hanover Insurance Company, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Co. (Racicot, Tara) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher P Williams on behalf of Hanover Insurance Company, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Co. (Williams, Christopher) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5598168.), filed by Massachusetts Bay Insurance Co., The Hanover Insurance Company.(Williams, Christopher) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/23/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Co. et al v. Arcadia Architectural Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Co.
Represented By: Christopher P Williams
Represented By: Tara Frances Racicot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher P Williams
Represented By: Tara Frances Racicot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcadia Architectural Products, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah E. Dlugoszewski
Represented By: Mark Kean Ostrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcadia Inc.
Represented By: Sarah E. Dlugoszewski
Represented By: Mark Kean Ostrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Poipu Point
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?