Tylor v. OLS Hotels & Resorts LLC
Plaintiff: Vincent Khoury Tylor
Defendant: Doe Associations 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10, OLS Hotels & Resorts LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company doing business as Plantation Hale Suites formerly known as OLS Hotels & Resorts, LP and OLS Hotels & Resorts, LP
3Rd Party Plaintiff: OLS Hotels & Resorts LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: CPS GRAPHICS, INC., dba TAMBOURINE
Case Number: 1:2020cv00291
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OLS Hotels & Resorts LLC identifying Corporate Parent SandOrchid Venture LLC, Corporate Parent Clarington, Inc. for OLS Hotels & Resorts LLC.. (Melchinger, Glenn)
August 20, 2020 Filing 14 DEFENDANT OLS HOTELS & RESORTS LLC, dba PLANTATION HALE SUITES, formerly OLS HOTELS & RESORTS, LP, dba PLANTATION HALE SUITES' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against CPS GRAPHICS, INC., dba TAMBOURINE by OLS Hotels & Resorts LLC. (Attachments: #1 Third Party Complaint, #2 Demand For Jury Trial, #3 [Proposed] Summons on a Third-Party Complaint)(Melchinger, Glenn)
July 24, 2020 Filing 13 EO: The Court GRANTS the parties' request to continue the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is continued from 08/31/2020 to 10/6/2020 at 09:30AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296, Access Code: 8224751. Plaintiff shall notify Defendant. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
July 24, 2020 Filing 12 Letter from Dane Anderson addressed to Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter, Joint Request to Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, dated July 23, 2020. (mrf)
July 7, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #1 Complaint and #10 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright has been served by First Class Mail to the Register of Copyrights, U.S. Copyright Office, 101 Independence Ave., S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000 on July 7, 2020. (emt, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vincent Khoury Tylor. OLS Hotels & Resorts LLC served on 7/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Anderson, Dane)
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Vincent Khoury Tylor (AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright) Vincent Khoury Tylor. (Anderson, Dane)
July 1, 2020 Filing 9 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS : Plaintiff's Counsel, please complete the attached AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. Please submit to the Clerk's Office, District of Hawaii, using the filing event "Notice (Other)". The Clerk's Office will transmit the AO 121 Report to the Register of Copyrights. (emt, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 8/31/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to OLS Hotels & Resorts LLC. (emt, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00291 DKW-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Vincent Khoury Tylor (of Related Cases) Vincent Khoury Tylor. (Street, J.)
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Vincent Khoury Tylor. (Street, J.)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Street, J.)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT AND DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT VIOLATIONS against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2390336.), filed by Vincent Khoury Tylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Street, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tylor v. OLS Hotels & Resorts LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Associations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLS Hotels & Resorts LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company doing business as Plantation Hale Suites formerly known as OLS Hotels & Resorts, LP
Represented By: Glenn T. Melchinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLS Hotels & Resorts, LP
Represented By: Glenn T. Melchinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Khoury Tylor
Represented By: J. Stephen Street
Represented By: Dane Kristofer Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: OLS Hotels & Resorts LLC
Represented By: Glenn T. Melchinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: CPS GRAPHICS, INC., dba TAMBOURINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?