North American Company for Life and Health Insurance v. Maley
Plaintiff: North American Company for Life and Health Insurance
Defendant: Chelsea Proenza Maley and Chelsea Proenza Parker
Case Number: 1:2020cv00317
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 16 EO: The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 09/14/2020 is CONTINUED to 11/02/2020 at 08:30AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. The Court will be using AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. Plaintiff shall notify Defendant. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. Chelsea Proenza Maley waiver sent on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Batterman, Scott)
August 7, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Novotny on behalf of North American Company for Life and Health Insurance on behalf of North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. (Novotny, David)
August 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig M. Bargher on behalf of North American Company for Life and Health Insurance on behalf of North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. (Bargher, Craig)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO DAVID J. NOVOTNY re #10 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 7/23/2020. (emt, )
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO CRAIG M. BARGHER re #9 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 7/23/2020. (emt, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of David J. Novotny Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2400042.Scott I. Batterman appearing for Plaintiff North American Company for Life and Health Insurance (Batterman, Scott)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Craig M. Bargher Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2400039.Scott I. Batterman appearing for Plaintiff North American Company for Life and Health Insurance (Batterman, Scott)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/14/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Chelsea Proenza Maley. (emt, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00317 LEK-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet by North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. (Batterman, Scott)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Batterman, Scott)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. (Batterman, Scott)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Rescission and Declaratory Judgment against Chelsea Proenza Maley ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2399091.), filed by North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Insurance Policy - Redacted), #2 Exhibit 2 (Application - Redacted))(Batterman, Scott) Modified on 7/20/2020 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North American Company for Life and Health Insurance v. Maley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea Proenza Maley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea Proenza Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North American Company for Life and Health Insurance
Represented By: Scott I. Batterman
Represented By: Craig M. Bargher
Represented By: David J. Novotny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?