Carlos-Kahalekomo v. County of Kauai et al
Plaintiff: Kaulana Nani Makalii Carlos-Kahalekomo
Defendant: Does 1-10, Patrick Porter, Robin Serquina, Wallace G. Rezentes Jr., Ellsworth Kaleiohi, Derek S.K. Kawakami and County of Kauai
Case Number: 1:2020cv00320
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered 9/10/2020 pursuant to ECF #6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/10/2020. Based on the foregoing, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for failure to state a claim and failure to prosecute. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case file. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 EO: The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 09/14/2020 is CONTINUED to 11/02/2020 at 08:45AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. The Court will be using AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, AND DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND re #2 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/3/2020. Based on the foregoing, Plaintiffs' IFP Application is GRANTED. The Complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend the Complaint by August 31, 2020 . Failure to amend the Complaint by August 31, 2020 will result in dismissal of this action with prejudice for failure to state a claim. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Kaulana Nani Makalii Carlos-Kahalekomo served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on August 3, 2020.
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 9/14/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) (jo)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION To Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form) - filed by Plaintiff Kaulana Nani Makalii Carlos-Kahalekomo (jo)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF CIVIL RIGHTS; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants - filed by Kaulana Nani Makalii Carlos-Kahalekomo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 (Proposed) Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Mailing Envelope) (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlos-Kahalekomo v. County of Kauai et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Serquina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace G. Rezentes Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellsworth Kaleiohi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek S.K. Kawakami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Kauai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaulana Nani Makalii Carlos-Kahalekomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?