Gouveia v. M. et al
Plaintiff: Roy Joshua Gouveia
Defendant: Sergeant Totau, Correctional Officer Justin Kanakaole, Sergeant Hedge, Captain Jackie M. and Correctional Officer Gazman
Interested Party: Shelley Harrington and Laurie Nadamoto
Case Number: 1:2020cv00342
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION AND DENYING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL re #8 , #9 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 9/25/2020. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Roy Joshua Gouveia served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on September 28, 2020. Additionally, a copy of the order was served by First Class Mail to the Warden and Financial Office of Halawa Correctional Facility at Halawa Correctional Facility, 99-902 Moanalua Rd Aiea, HI 96701 on September 28, 2020. DPS Litigation Coordinators Shelley Nobriga Harrington, Esq., Laurie Nadamoto, Esq. and the Financial Department for the District of Hawaii received the order electronically.
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Request for a Hearing - by Plaintiff Roy Joshua Gouveia. (emt, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner - by Plaintiff Roy Joshua Gouveia. (emt, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 ORIGINAL SIGNATURE of Roy Joshua Gouveia submitted re #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
August 28, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of ECF No. #5 ORDER DENYING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION AND MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL and a blank Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner form and instructions shall be reserved to Roy Joshua Gouveia at Halawa Correctional Facility (pursuant to the Notice of Change of Address filed on August 27, 2020). Additionally, the following documents previously sent to Mr. Gouveia at Saguaro Correctional Center, have been resent to Mr. Gouveia at Halawa Correctional Facility : Advisory Entry-No Signature and copy of unsigned Complaint, file-stamped copies of ECF No. #2 DECLARATION in Support of Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and ECF No. #3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, ECF No. 4 Minute Order. (emt, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address - by Roy Joshua Gouveia. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION AND MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL re #2 , #3 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 8/25/2020. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Roy Joshua Gouveia shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on August 26, 2020. A blank Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner form and instructions shall be included in the mailing to Mr. Gouveia. Modified on 8/26/2020 (emt, ).
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake on the court's website. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 11, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the Advisory Entry-No Signature and filed copies of the Complaint, Declaration in Support of Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and the Motion for Appointment of Counsel shall be served by First Class Mail to Roy Joshua Gouveia at the address of record on August 11, 2020. A "business reply" envelope was included in the mailing to Mr. Gouveia for the return of the signed Complaint. (emt, ) Modified on 8/11/2020 (emt, ).
August 11, 2020 ADVISORY ENTRY. No Signature-Please be advised that Document #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Roy Joshua Gouveia, is not signed. A copy of the Complaint shall be returned to Mr. Gouveia who is instructed to sign and return the copy of the Complaint to the Clerk's Office. (emt, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel - by Plaintiff Roy Joshua Gouveia. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION in Support of Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis - by Plaintiff Roy Joshua Gouveia. (emt, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT, "Jury Trial Demanded" against All Defendants - filed by Roy Joshua Gouveia. This document is not signed. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gouveia v. M. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Totau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Justin Kanakaole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Hedge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Jackie M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Gazman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Joshua Gouveia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Laurie Nadamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?