State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Santiago
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: Clement Santiago
Case Number: 1:2020cv00349
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPORT of Planning Meeting by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shibuya, Ashley) Modified on 10/12/2020 (emt, ).
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Plaintiff State Farm Fire Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shibuya, Ashley) Modified on 10/12/2020 (emt, ).
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Defendant's Scheduling Conference Statement . (Brustein, David) Modified on 9/27/2020 (emt, ).
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Defendant's Answer ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Clement Santiago.(Brustein, David)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Clement Santiago served on 8/29/2020. (Shibuya, Ashley)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake on the court's website. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number HI029161 re #1 Complaint (emt, )
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Shibuya, Ashley)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/19/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Clement Santiago. (emt, )
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00349 JAO-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation. (Shibuya, Ashley)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Clement Santiago (Filing fee $ 400. HI029161), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons (proposed))(Shibuya, Ashley) Modified on 8/17/2020 ECF No. #9 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number HI029161 re #1 Complaint (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clement Santiago
Represented By: David S. Brustein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Ashley R. Shibuya
Represented By: Richard B. Miller
Represented By: Patricia K. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?