American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas v. My Thai Maui LLC et al
Plaintiff: American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas
Defendant: Mayrin Portama, My Thai Maui LLC and Matthew White
Case Number: 1:2020cv00351
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 17 EO: In light of the #16 Judgment entered, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/19/2020 is hereby VACATED. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
August 31, 2020 Filing 16 JUDGMENT in favor of American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas against My Thai Maui LLC, Matthew White, Mayrin Portama - Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 8/31/2020. (jo)
August 28, 2020 ADVISORY ENTRY-Submission of Proposed Orders - Please be advised that Document #15 Stipulation requires the judge's signature. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the document in Microsoft Word format to the applicable chambers' email address. See Section 10.4- Emailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations to Chambers, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide for additional instructions and a list of judge's email addresses. (jo)
August 28, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT by American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment)(Morison, William)
August 24, 2020 ADVISORY ENTRY-Incorrect Event- Please be advised that an incorrect filing event was selected for docket entries #12 , #13 , and #14 . The docket text has been modified. For the filing party's future reference, a helpful tool in determining the correct filing event is the "SEARCH" option located on the CM/ECF tool bar. A text window will appear wherein the filer may type in the word that describes the filing. (jo)
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas. MAYRIN PORTAMA served on 8/19/2020. (Morison, William) Docket Text Modified on 8/24/2020 (jo)
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas. MATTHEW WHITE served on 8/19/2020. (Morison, William) Docket Text Modified on 8/24/2020 (jo)
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas. MY THAI MAUI LLC served on 8/19/2020. (Morison, William) Docket Text Modified on 8/24/2020 (jo)
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 10/19/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Mayrin Portama. (emt, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Matthew White. (emt, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to My Thai Maui LLC. (emt, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00351 HG-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas identifying Corporate Parent Hallmark Financial Services, Inc. for American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas.. (Morison, William)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons (Proposed) (Morison, William)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Morison, William)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Morison, William)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2411543.), filed by American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morison, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas v. My Thai Maui LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas
Represented By: William C. Morison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayrin Portama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: My Thai Maui LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?