Paul v. Great Lakes Insurance SE
Plaintiff: Julia Paul
Defendant: Great Lakes Insurance SE, Doe Limited Liability Companies 1-10, Doe Trusts 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Doe Not-For-Profit Entities 1-10, Great Lakes Reinsurance Company, Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10, Doe Entities 1-10 and Doe Governmental Agencies 1-10
Case Number: 1:2020cv00356
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO CHRISTOPHER T. HELLUMS re: #14 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 10/5/2020. CHRISTOPHER T. HELLUMS, ESQ. (Firm: Pittman, Dutton & Hellums, P.C.) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice as to Plaintiff Julia Paul (jo)
October 1, 2020 ADVISORY ENTRY-Submission of Proposed Orders - Please be advised that Document #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice includes a proposed order that requires the judge's signature. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the document to the applicable chambers' email address. See Section 10.4- Emailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations to Chambers, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide for additional instructions and a list of judge's email addresses. (jo)
October 1, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Christopher T. Hellums, Esq. Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2429644.Jeffrey E. Foster appearing for Plaintiff Julia Paul (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Of Counsel, #2 (Proposed) Order Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Foster, Jeffrey)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO EDWARD K. WOOD re: #12 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 9/25/2020. EDWARD K. WOOD, ESQ. added as attorney Pro Hac Vice as to Plaintiff Julia Paul(jo)
September 24, 2020 ADVISORY ENTRY- Submission of Proposed Orders - Please be advised that Document #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice includes a proposed order for the Judge's signature. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the document to the applicable chambers' email address. See Section 10.4- Emailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations to Chambers, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide for additional instructions and a list of judge's email addresses. (jo)
September 24, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Edward K. Wood Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2426702.Jeffrey E. Foster appearing for Plaintiff Julia Paul (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Of Counsel, #2 (Proposed) Order Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Foster, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 9/21/2020. (jo)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 EP: TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held. Dates given. Court to prepare Scheduling Order. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09/28/2021 at 9:00 a.m. before JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 08/17/2021 at 9:45 a.m. in Telephonic Hearing before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Early Settlement Conference is set for 12/11/2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Video Conference Hearing before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 06/25/2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Video Conference Hearing before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 4/28/2021. Discovery due by 7/30/2021. Until further notice, for all hearings before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield, parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668(AT&T Service/ 9:31 - 9:34) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
September 16, 2020 ADVISORY ENTRY-No Identification of Person Filing Document- Please be advised that Document #8 Scheduling Conference Statement does not include information that identifies the filer. The name, Hawaii bar identification number, address, telephone number, and email address of counsel (or, if pro se, of the party), and the specific identification of each party represented by name and interest in the litigation (e.g., plaintiff, defendant, etc.) shall appear in the upper left corner of the first page of each document presented for filing. See L.R. 10.2 (b). (jo)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 EO: #4 The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 09/21/2020 at 9:30 a.m. will be held via telephone. In accordance to the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 Plaintiff Julia Paul's Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Foster, Jeffrey) Docket Text Modified on 9/16/2020 (jo)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 Scheduling Conference Statement DEFENDANT S RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wesley-Smith, Ian)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian R. Wesley-Smith on behalf of Great Lakes Insurance SE (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wesley-Smith, Ian)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 Scheduling Conference Statement Joint Discovery Plan. (Foster, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30 AM on 9/21/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00356 SOM-KJM on all further pleadings. (jni)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great Lakes Insurance SE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Egesdal, Steven)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Great Lakes Insurance SE from CIRCUIT COURT OF THE THIRD CIRCUIT, STATE OF HI, case number 3CCV-20-0000185. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2412330), filed by Great Lakes Insurance SE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brenda Badders, #2 Exhibit 1_Complaint filed, #3 Exhibit 2_Request to Exempt Case from CAAP,Summary of Facts, #4 Exhibit 3_Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit 4_Answer to Complaint, #6 Certificate of Service, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Egesdal, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul v. Great Lakes Insurance SE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Insurance SE
Represented By: Steven M. Egesdal
Represented By: Ian R. Wesley-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Limited Liability Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Trusts 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Not-For-Profit Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Reinsurance Company
Represented By: Steven M. Egesdal
Represented By: Ian R. Wesley-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Agencies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Paul
Represented By: Christopher T. Hellums
Represented By: Edward K. Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?