Abott et al v. Connors
Plaintiff: Soleil Roache, Jon Abbott and Kevin Lloyd L. Kacatin
Defendant: Clare E. Connors
Case Number: 1:2020cv00360
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 16 Scheduling Conference Statement of Defendant Clare E. Connors. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Akamine, Ryan)
September 30, 2020 Filing 15 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Beck, Alan)
September 30, 2020 Filing 14 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Beck, Alan)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Plaintiffs Abbott, Kacatin, Roache, and Defendant Connors. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Please continue to reflect Civil case number CV 20-00360 RT on all further pleadings. (jni)
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 Consent Election Form
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant Clare E. Connors', In Her Official Capacity As The Attorney General Of The State Of Hawaii, ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, For Declaratory And Injuncive Relief by Clare E. Connors. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Akamine, Ryan)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jon Abbott. All Defendants. Defendant Clare E. Connors served on 8/26/2020. (Beck, Alan) Docket Text Modified on 9/1/2020 (jni)
August 30, 2020 Filing 9 Consent Election Form
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 First AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by Jon Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration)(Beck, Alan) Docket Text Modified on 8/24/2020 (jni)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jni)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Clare E. Connors. (jni)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00 AM on 10/19/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 8/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00360 RT on all further pleadings. (jni)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Beck, Alan)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 Intervenor COMPLAINT, VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2413050.), filed by Jon Abott Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration)(Beck, Alan) Docket Text Modified on 8/20/2020. (jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abott et al v. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clare E. Connors
Represented By: Ryan M. Akamine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soleil Roache
Represented By: Alan A. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Abbott
Represented By: Alan A. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Lloyd L. Kacatin
Represented By: Alan A. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?