Rowe v. Mainley et al
Plaintiff: Marcus Lee Rowe
Defendant: Brian Mainley and Police Officer Nungh
Case Number: 1:2020cv00367
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered 10/8/2020 pursuant to ECF 4 (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 8, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of EO 4 has been served by First Class Mail to the address of record to: Marcus Lee Rowe. (tl)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 EO: On 8/26/20, the Court ordered Plaintiff to submit an in forma pauperis application or filing fee within twenty-eight days [ECF 2]. Plaintiff has failed to timely do so. The Court has considered the five factors set forth in Ferdik v. Bonzelet, 963 F.2d 1258, 1260 (9th Cir. 1992), and DIRECTS the Clerk to ENTER JUDGMENT dismissing this action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). See In re Phenylpropanolamine (PPA) Prod. Liab. Litig., 460 F.3d 1217, 1226 (9th Cir. 2006); Malone v. U.S. Postal Serv., 833 F.2d 128, 132-33 (9th Cir. 1987). (JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR)(tl)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 28, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - a copy of #1 Complaint, #2 Deficiency Order, and #3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference have been served by First Class Mail to Marcus Lee Rowe at the address of record on August 28, 2020. (jo)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 10/26/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo From the Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (jo)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/26/2020. (jo)COURT's CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Marcus Lee Rowe (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowe v. Mainley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Mainley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Nungh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Lee Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?