Lobisch et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: James Lobisch and Anna Lobisch
Defendant: Island Palm Communities, LLC, Doe Defendants 1-10 and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00370
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 25 EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 9:30 a.m. IS ADVANCED TO 9:00 a.m. on same date of 10/26/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. In accordance to the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
October 22, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anna Lobisch, James Lobisch re Plaintiffs' Notice of Taking Deposition Upon Written Interrogatories; Ex A of the Honolulu Police Department (Sheehan, Loretta)
October 22, 2020 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint (Declaration of Loretta A. Sheehan re Service on USA) served on USA on 10-16-20, filed by Anna Lobisch, James Lobisch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Sheehan, Loretta)
October 20, 2020 Filing 22 Defendant Island Palm Communities, LLC's Scheduling Conference Statement (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wack, Shannon) Modified on 10/20/2020 (jo)
October 15, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anna Lobisch, James Lobisch Re Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Island Palm Communities, LLC (Sheehan, Loretta)
October 15, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anna Lobisch, James Lobisch re: Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant USA (Sheehan, Loretta)
October 15, 2020 Filing 19 Defendant United States of America's Scheduling Conference Statement ; COS (Yee, Harry) Modified on 10/15/2020 (jo)
October 13, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anna Lobisch, James Lobisch re #16 Scheduling Conference Statement served by email not electronic filing (Sheehan, Loretta)
October 13, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anna Lobisch, James Lobisch re #15 Report of Planning Meeting Served by email not electronic filing (Sheehan, Loretta)
October 13, 2020 Filing 16 Scheduling Conference Statement Rule 16 by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sheehan, Loretta)
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 REPORT of Planning Meeting Rule 26(f) by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sheehan, Loretta)
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Lobisch, James Lobisch. United States of America served on 9/10/2020. (Sheehan, Loretta)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Lobisch, James Lobisch. Island Palm Communities, LLC served on 9/10/2020. (Sheehan, Loretta)
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to All Defendants (jo)
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 Summons (Proposed) (Sheehan, Loretta)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Anna Lobisch, James Lobisch (Sheehan, Loretta)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS re: #4 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 8/31/2020. Based on the foregoing, the Court DENIES Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion (ECF No #4 ). Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint that identifies A.L. and Z.L. by their full names no later than September 7, 2020. (jo)
August 28, 2020 ADVISORY ENTRY-Submission of Proposed Orders - Please be advised that Document #4 EX PARTE Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms includes an order for the Judge's signature. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the document in Microsoft Word format to the applicable chambers' email address. See Section 10.4- Emailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations to Chambers, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide for additional instructions and a list of judge's email addresses. (jo)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30 AM on 10/26/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00370 HG-KJM on all further pleadings. (jni)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 EX PARTE Request Declaration of Loretta A Sheehan re Pseudonyms filed under seal Loretta A. Sheehan appearing for Plaintiffs A. L., Z. L., Anna Lobisch, James Lobisch (Sheehan, Loretta)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 EX PARTE Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms Loretta A. Sheehan appearing for Plaintiffs A. L., Z. L., Anna Lobisch, James Lobisch (Attachments: #1 Declaration Loretta A. Sheehan, #2 Order Granting Ex Parte Motion)(Sheehan, Loretta)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (Sheehan, Loretta)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by A. L., Z. L., Anna Lobisch, James Lobisch. (Sheehan, Loretta)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Against All Defendants USA and ISLAND PALM COMMUNITIES, LLC, a Foreign Limited Liability Company against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2415753.), filed by Anna Lobisch, Z. L., A. L., James Lobisch.(Sheehan, Loretta) Docket Text Modified on 8/27/2020 (jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lobisch et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Palm Communities, LLC
Represented By: Shannon L. Wack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Harry Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lobisch
Represented By: Loretta A. Sheehan
Represented By: Mark S. Davis
Represented By: Michael K. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Lobisch
Represented By: Loretta A. Sheehan
Represented By: Mark S. Davis
Represented By: Michael K. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?