Allstate Insurance Company v. Ajirogi
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Michael Ajirogi
Case Number: 1:2020cv00382
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 11/2/2020. (jo)
November 2, 2020 Filing 14 EP: TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held.Parties report two (2) related state court actions: Bennett Strobel v. Michael Ajirogi,et.al., Case No. 1CCV-20-0000710, pending in First Circuit Court and a divorce action pending in Family Court (collectively, "Related Cases"). Parties open to exploring global resolution.Court sets Confidential Telephone Conference for 2/5/2021 at 9:30 before Magistrate Judge Trader. No submissions required. Parties to be prepared to discuss the status of the Related Cases, discovery, prospects for global resolution, and readiness for early settlement discussions. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-4735.2. Enter Access Code 2070326.Rule 16 Scheduling Order to issue.Dates given: Jury Selection/Trial is set for 2/8/2022 at 09:00 AM before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/28/2021 at 09:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference is set for 11/10/2021 10:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference Statements due by 11/3/2021. Confidential Telephone Conference is set for 2/5/2021 at 09:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Dispositive Motions filed by 9/8/2021. Discovery due by 12/10/2021. (ATT / 9:10 - 9:20 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
October 30, 2020 Filing 13 EO: Dial-in instructions for Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader are listed below.Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.1. Dial 1-888-363-4735.2. Access Code 2070326. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
October 26, 2020 Filing 12 Plaintiff Allstate Insurance Company's Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shibuya, Ashley) Modified on 10/27/2020 (jo)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Uesugi, Glenn)
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 Defendant Michael Ajirogi's Scheduling Conference Statement (Uesugi, Glenn) Docket Text Modified on 10/5/2020 (jo)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Michael Ajirogi. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Certificate of Service)(Uesugi, Glenn)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Michael Ajirogi served on 9/29/2020. (Shibuya, Ashley)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Michael Ajirogi. (jni)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00 AM on 11/2/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00382 JMS-RT on all further pleadings.(jni)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company. (Shibuya, Ashley)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Shibuya, Ashley)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Allstate Insurance Company Michael Ajirogi Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0975-2419249., filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shibuya, Ashley) Modified on 9/4/2020 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Ajirogi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Ashley R. Shibuya
Represented By: Richard B. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ajirogi
Represented By: Michael Jay Green
Represented By: Glenn H. Uesugi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?