Willis v. Sequeira
Petitioner: Erik Willis
Respondent: Francis Sequeira
Case Number: 1:2020cv00386
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David Van Acker on behalf of Francis Sequeira on behalf of Francis Sequeira. (Acker, David Van)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY re #7 Answer to Complaint,, filed by Erik Willis. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Eric A. Seitz, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Certificate of Service)(Seitz, Eric)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 Answer to #1 Petition for Writ of Habaes Corpus ANSWER to Complaint by Francis Sequeira. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Appendix A, #3 Appendix B, #4 Appendix C, #5 Appendix D, #6 Appendix E, #7 Appendix F, #8 Appendix G, #9 Appendix H, #10 Appendix I, #11 Appendix J, #12 Appendix K, #13 Appendix L, #14 Appendix M, #15 Certificate of Compliance, #16 Certificate of Service)(Tsushima, Stephen) Modified on 10/1/2020 to add linkage to petition (emt, ).
September 29, 2020 ADVISORY ENTRY. Incorrect Attorney Filer - Please be advised that Documents #4 Answer to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #5 Errata filed by Francis Sequeira was signed by an attorney other than the one identified as the e-filer. The name of the CM/ECF User under whose login and password the document is being electronically filed must correspond to the signature of the attorney signing the CM/ECF filed document. The filing party shall use its discretion should they feel the necessity to re-submit corrected filings. Additionally, the filing party may refer to Section 7.1 CM/ECF User's Signature, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide, which states "The name of the CM/ECF user under whose login and password the document is being electronically filed must be preceded by "/s/" and typed in the space where the signature otherwise would appear.( e.g./s/John or Jane Lawyer)". Lastly, the filing party may refer to the Court's website, www.hid.uscourts.gov for information concerning CM/ECF registration. (emt, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #3 Order to Show Cause (Declaration Of Francis Sequeira In Response To #1 Petitioner Erik Willis Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus; Declaration Of Francis Sequeira; Certificate Of Service) filed by Francis Sequeira. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Francis Sequeira, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Itomura, Lisa) Modified on 9/29/2020 (emt, ).
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 Errata re #4 Answer to Complaint, . (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents and Table of Authorities)(Tsushima, Stephen) Modified on 9/29/2020 This document is signed by David Van Acker (emt, ).
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 Answer to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ANSWER to Complaint by Francis Sequeira. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Appendix A, #3 Appendix B, #4 Appendix C, #5 Appendix D, #6 Appendix E, #7 Appendix F, #8 Appendix G, #9 Appendix H, #10 Appendix I, #11 Appendix J, #12 Appendix K, #13 Appendix L, #14 Appendix M, #15 Certificate of Compliance, #16 Certificate of Service)(Tsushima, Stephen) Modified on 9/29/2020 This document is signed by David Van Acker (emt, ).
September 16, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - The #3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus was served electronically to the Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii to the following email addresses: atg.habeascorpuspetitions@hawaii.gov, ardif.l.arakaki@hawaii.gov and pheola.l.kuamoo@hawaii.com on September 16, 2020. Additionally, of copy of the Order to Show Cause and the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus shall be served by First Class Mail to the Office of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii at 425 Queen Street, Honolulu, HI 96813 on September 17, 2020. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, ) Modified on 9/16/2020 (emt, ).
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 9/16/2020. This Court therefore ORDERS, pursuant to Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts (" 2254 Rules"), that Respondent Francis Sequeira, Warden of Oahu Community Correctional Center ("the Warden") file an answer to the Petition on or before September 28, 2020. Willis may file an optional reply to the answer by no later than October 1, 2020. The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to send a copy of the Petition and the instant Order to Show Cause to the Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawai'i, electronically to the following email address: atg.habeascorpuspetitions@hawaii.gov, ardif.l.arakaki@hawaii.gov, and pheola.l.kuamoo@hawaii.gov. The Department of the Attorney General has agreed to forward these documents to the appropriate Department of the Prosecuting Attorney. Show Cause Response due by 9/28/2020. (emt, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 20-00386 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. (jo)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0975-2420403.), filed by Erik Willis. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric A. Seitz, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Verification of Eric A. Seitz, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seitz, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. Sequeira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Francis Sequeira
Represented By: David Van Acker
Represented By: Lisa M. Itomura
Represented By: Stephen K. Tsushima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Erik Willis
Represented By: Gina May Szeto-Wong
Represented By: Eric A. Seitz
Represented By: Della A. Belatti
Represented By: Kevin A Yolken
Represented By: Jonathan M.F. Loo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?