State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Harris et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Jonathan Lee Harris and Kelley Meyer Harris
Case Number: 1:2020cv00387
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 10 EO: Per the request of Plaintiff's counsel, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2020 at 9:00 AM is CONTINUED to 1/13/2021 at 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-4735.2. Access Code 2070326. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Kelley Meyer Harris served on 9/23/2020. (Shibuya, Ashley)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Jonathan Lee Harris served on 9/23/2020. (Shibuya, Ashley)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.. (Shibuya, Ashley)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 11/9/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (emt, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00387 ACK-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Shibuya, Ashley)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Jonathan Lee Harris, Kelley Meyer Harris Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0975-2420508., filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shibuya, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Harris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Richard B. Miller
Represented By: Ashley R. Shibuya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Lee Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelley Meyer Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?