Turner v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Deborah Turner
Defendant: Roe Governmental Entities 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Target Corporation, Roe "Non-Profit" Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10 and Doe Corporations 1-10
Case Number: 1:2020cv00393
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Target Corporation Re: Target's First Request for Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Yoshimoto, Donna)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 10/19/2020. (emt, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 14 EP: TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held. Dates given. Court to prepare Scheduling Order. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 01/19/2022 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/07/2021 at 9:45 a.m. via telephone before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Early Settlement Conference is set for 12/16/2020 at 10:00 a.m. via Video Tele-Conference (VTC) before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 10/18/2021 at 10:00 a.m. via Video Tele-Conference (VTC) before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 08/18/2021. Discovery due by 11/19/2021. In accordance to the United States District Court for the District of Hawaiis latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency, due to the uncertainty of the ongoing pandemic and to minimize traffic into the Courthouse, at this time, hard copies of any settlement conference statements need not be delivered to the Clerk's Office. Instead, parties are to submit their confidential settlement statements via email to mansfield_orders@hid.uscourts.gov.The Court will be sending out a separate email providing counsel detailed instructions regarding Video Tele-Conference (VTC) access prior to the conference date.Until further notice, all other hearings before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield, parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668(AT&T Service / 9:00 - 9:07) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
October 16, 2020 Filing 13 EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference TIME IS CONTINUED TO 9:00 a.m. ON THE SAME DATE OF 10/19/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. In accordance to the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
October 12, 2020 Filing 12 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Deborah Turner. (Remillard, Laurent)
October 12, 2020 Filing 11 Scheduling Conference Statement Plaintiff's Scheduling Conference Statement. (Remillard, Laurent)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Plaintiff Deborah Turner and Defendant Target Corporation. Please continue to reflect case number CV 20-00393 KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 Consent Election Form
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Target Corporation. (Yoshimoto, Donna)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 Scheduling Conference Statement Defendant Target Corporation. (Yoshimoto, Donna)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 Consent Election Form
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT of Planning Meeting by Plaintiff Deborah Turner . (Remillard, Laurent) Modified on 10/1/2020 (emt, ).
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction) While the decision to consent or not to consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is entirely voluntarily, the duty to respond to this notice is mandatory. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date onwhich the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return th completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 10/19/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00393 KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation from Third Circuit Court, case number 3CC191000284. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2422862), filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Certificate of Service)(Yoshimoto, Donna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Governmental Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Donna A.O. Yoshimoto
Represented By: Jason H. Fieman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe "Non-Profit" Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Turner
Represented By: Don V. Huynh
Represented By: Rechelle A.M. Barbour
Represented By: Laurent J. Remillard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?