Association of Apartment Owners of Hanalei Bay Resort, The v. RSUI Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Association of Apartment Owners of Hanalei Bay Resort
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10, RSUI Indemnity Company, Doe Corporations 1-10 and Doe Entities 1-10
Case Number: 1:2020cv00414
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 11 EO: In light of ECF #10 Order Granting Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings, the Court VACATES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference scheduled for 11/30/20 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. The Court sets a Confidential Telephone Conference for 6/15/21 at 8:45 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. Parties to submit a joint status report of no more than 3 pages by 6/8/2021.Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-4735.2. Access Code 2070326. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa, )
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING CONSENT MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS re #8 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 11/5/2020. (emt, )
November 5, 2020 Filing 9 EO: Due to a scheduling conflict, the Court CONTINUES the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2020 at 9:00AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER to 10:00AM the SAME DAY. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-4735.2. Access Code 2070326. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings Michael C. Carroll appearing for Plaintiff Association of Apartment Owners of Hanalei Bay Resort (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Carroll, Michael)
October 29, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Association of Apartment Owners of Hanalei Bay Resort. RSUI Indemnity Company served on 10/16/2020. (Carroll, Michael)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Association of Apartment Owners of Hanalei Bay Resort. (Paris, Sharon)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to RSUI Indemnity Company (jo)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:0 0AM on 11/30/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo From the Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 20-00414 DKW-RT on all further pleadings. (jo)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RSUI Indemnity Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2429205.), filed by Sharon Paris, Michael C. Carroll. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons to Answer Complaint (Proposed), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carroll, Michael) Docket Text Modified on 9/30/2020 (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Association of Apartment Owners of Hanalei Bay Resort, The v. RSUI Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of Apartment Owners of Hanalei Bay Resort
Represented By: Sharon Paris
Represented By: Michael C. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSUI Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?