Ali v. Akamai Vessel Operations, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Abdulataef Ali
Defendant: Akamai Vessel Operations, LLC, Pasha Hawaii SG Co, LLC and Pasha Hawaii Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00416
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Abdulataef Ali - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/24/2020. (jo)
November 20, 2020 ADVISORY ENTRY - Please be advised that pursuant to LR41.1, docket entry #8 Notice of Dismissal requires the Judge's signature. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the document in Microsoft Word format to the applicable chambers' email address. See Section 10.4- Emailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations to Chambers, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide for additional instructions and a list of judge's email addresses. (jo)
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice Abdulataef Ali. (O'Bryan, Dennis)
November 11, 2020 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pasha Hawaii Holdings, LLC, filed by Abdulataef Ali. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Reliance on previously filed demand for trial by jury)(O'Bryan, Dennis) Modified on 11/12/2020 (jo)
October 1, 2020 ADVISORY ENTRY-No Identification of Person Filing Document- Please be advised that Document #1 Complaint does not include information that identifies the filer. The name, Hawaii bar identification number, address, telephone number, and email address of counsel (or, if pro se, of the party), and the specific identification of each party represented by name and interest in the litigation (e.g., plaintiff, defendant, etc.) shall appear in the upper left corner of the first page of each document presented for filing. See L.R. 10.2 (b). (jo)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Pasha Hawaii SG Co, LLC (jo)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Akamai Vessel Operations, LLC (jo)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 11/30/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 20-00416 JMS-KJM on all further pleadings. (jo)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Akamai Vessel Operations, LLC, Pasha Hawaii SG Co, LLC, filed by Abdulataef Ali. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Waiver of Pre-Payment of Fees and Costs)(O'Bryan, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali v. Akamai Vessel Operations, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdulataef Ali
Represented By: Dennis M. O'Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akamai Vessel Operations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pasha Hawaii SG Co, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pasha Hawaii Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?